Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 272). (text: CR H2973)
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2978-2979)
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1606.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2973-2975)
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Mr. Ellzey moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 75.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 118-98.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported Without Recommendation by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 0.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|