1 | 1 | | I |
---|
2 | 2 | | 118THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION H. R. 1760 |
---|
5 | 5 | | To extend the admission to Guam or the Commonwealth of the Northern |
---|
6 | 6 | | Mariana Islands for certain nonimmigrant H–2B workers. |
---|
7 | 7 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
8 | 8 | | MARCH23, 2023 |
---|
9 | 9 | | Mr. M |
---|
10 | 10 | | OYLANintroduced the following bill; which was referred to the Com- |
---|
11 | 11 | | mittee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the |
---|
12 | 12 | | Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in |
---|
13 | 13 | | each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdic- |
---|
14 | 14 | | tion of the committee concerned |
---|
15 | 15 | | A BILL |
---|
16 | 16 | | To extend the admission to Guam or the Commonwealth |
---|
17 | 17 | | of the Northern Mariana Islands for certain non- |
---|
18 | 18 | | immigrant H–2B workers. |
---|
19 | 19 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1 |
---|
20 | 20 | | tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2 |
---|
21 | 21 | | SECTION 1. EXTENSION OF ADMISSION TO GUAM OR THE 3 |
---|
22 | 22 | | COMMONWEALTH OF THE NORTHERN MAR-4 |
---|
23 | 23 | | IANA ISLANDS FOR CERTAIN NONIMMIGRANT 5 |
---|
24 | 24 | | H–2B WORKERS. 6 |
---|
25 | 25 | | Section 6(b)(1)(B) of the Joint Resolution entitled 7 |
---|
26 | 26 | | ‘‘A Joint Resolution to approve the ‘Covenant to Establish 8 |
---|
27 | 27 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:54 Apr 06, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H1760.IH H1760 |
---|
28 | 28 | | kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 2 |
---|
29 | 29 | | •HR 1760 IH |
---|
30 | 30 | | a Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands in Po-1 |
---|
31 | 31 | | litical Union with the United States of America’, and for 2 |
---|
32 | 32 | | other purposes’’, approved March 24, 1976 (48 U.S.C. 11 3 |
---|
33 | 33 | | 1806(b)(1)(B)), is amended, in the matter preceding 4 |
---|
34 | 34 | | clause (i), by striking ‘‘December 31, 2024’’ and inserting 5 |
---|
35 | 35 | | ‘‘December 31, 2029’’. 6 |
---|
36 | 36 | | Æ |
---|
37 | 37 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:54 Apr 06, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H1760.IH H1760 |
---|
38 | 38 | | kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS |
---|