Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 227 - 201 (Roll no. 116).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
On motion to recommit Failed by recorded vote: 208 - 220 (Roll no. 115).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Ms. Schrier moved to recommit to the Committee on Energy and Commerce. (text: CR H760)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The House adopted the amendments en gross as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 185.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
H.Amdt.84 On agreeing to the Torres (CA) amendment (A005) Failed by recorded vote: 209 - 224 (Roll no. 114).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
H.Amdt.83 On agreeing to the Rose amendment (A004) Agreed to by recorded vote: 426 - 8 (Roll no. 113).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
H.Amdt.82 On agreeing to the Golden (ME) amendment (A003) Failed by recorded vote: 207 - 220 (Roll no. 112).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
H.Amdt.81 On agreeing to the Boebert amendment (A002) Agreed to by recorded vote: 253 - 168 (Roll no. 111).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
H.Amdt.80 On agreeing to the McGovern amendment (A001) Failed by recorded vote: 210 - 222 (Roll no. 110).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
UNFINISHED BUSINES - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was on the question of agreeing to amendments, which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The House resolved into Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union for further consideration.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H757-762)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H.R. 185 as unfinished business.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
On motion that the committee rise Agreed to by voice vote.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Mr. Bucshon moved that the committee rise.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Torres (CA) amendment No. 5, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Pallone demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 97, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Torres (CA) amendment No. 5.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
H.Amdt.84 Amendment (A005) offered by Mrs. Torres (CA). (consideration: CR H756, H760; text: CR H756)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Rose amendment No. 4, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Pallone demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 97, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Rose amendment No. 4.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
H.Amdt.83 Amendment (A004) offered by Mr. Rose. (consideration: CR H755-756, H759-760; text: CR H755)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Golden (ME) amendment No. 3, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Pallone demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 97, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Golden (ME) amendment No. 3.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
H.Amdt.82 Amendment (A003) offered by Mr. Golden (ME). (consideration: CR H754-755, H758-759; text: CR H754)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Boebert amendment No. 2, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mrs. Boebert demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 97, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Boebert amendment No. 2.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
H.Amdt.81 Amendment (A002) offered by Mrs. Boebert. (consideration: CR H754, H758; text: CR H754)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the McGovern amendment No. 1, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Pallone demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 97, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the McGovern amendment No. 1.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
H.Amdt.80 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. McGovern. (consideration: CR H753-754, H757-758; text: CR H753)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 185.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The Speaker designated the Honorable Kevin Kiley to act as Chairman of the Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 97 and Rule XVIII.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 185, H.J. Res. 24 and H.J. Res. 26 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 97. (consideration: CR H747-757; text: CR H752-753)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 97 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 185, H.J. Res. 24 and H.J. Res. 26 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|