12/18/2024 { { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }} | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-926, Part I. | Action Code: H12200, Type: Committee | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 17. | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry. | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Introduced in House |