|
12/17/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
|
Action Code: H11000, Type: Committee
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 71.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 213 (Roll no. 209). (text: 5/10/2023 CR H2195-2216)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 211 - 221 (Roll no. 208).
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2293-2294)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair put the question on the motion to recommit the bill and by voice vote announced the noes had prevailed. Ms. Garcia (TX) demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postoned further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Ms. Garcia (TX) moved to recommit to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR H2281)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
DEBATE - The House resumed with further debate on H.R. 2.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2258-2281)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, the Chair announced that consideration of H.R. 2 would now resume.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, the Chair announced further proceedings on H. R. 2 would be postponed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with five hours of debate on H.R. 2.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2 and H.R. 1163. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2 under a closed rule with five hours of general debate, and the resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1163 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate. The resolution provides for a motion to recommit on each measure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 383. (consideration: CR H2195-2236)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 383 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2 and H.R. 1163. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2 under a closed rule with five hours of general debate, and the resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1163 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate. The resolution provides for a motion to recommit on each measure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|