|
12/19/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 773.
|
Action Code: H12410, Type: Calendars
|
|
House
|
11/18/2024
|
House Committee on Agriculture Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 19, 2024.
|
|
|
House
|
11/18/2024
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-748, Part I.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Subcommittee Hearings Held.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry.
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|