12/18/2024 { { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }} | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 751. | Action Code: H12410, Type: Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 17. | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries Discharged. | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Subcommittee Hearings Held | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Introduced in House |