Senate | 01/25/2023 | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 4. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Received in the Senate. | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 331 - 97 (Roll no. 31). (text: CR H209) | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 22. | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 5. (consideration: CR H209-219) | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Introduced in House |