Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB225

Introduced
1/9/23  

Caption

No Budget, No Pay Act This bill withholds the salaries of Members of a chamber of Congress that has not agreed to a budget resolution for FY2024 by April 15, 2023, as required by the Congressional Budget Act of 1974. Salaries are withheld from April 16, 2023, until the earlier of (1) the day on which the chamber of Congress agrees to a budget resolution, or (2) the last day of the 118th Congress.

Impact

If enacted, HB225 could lead to a notable shift in Congressional operations, as members would face immediate financial consequences for any delays in budget resolutions. By tying their pay to timely agreements, the bill seeks to encourage legislators to prioritize the budgeting process and avoid last-minute negotiations. This change aims to ensure that the government operates without extended lapses in budget approval, which can lead to government shutdowns and disruptions in federal services.

Summary

House Bill 225, known as the 'No Budget, No Pay Act', aims to implement a significant change in the way Congress approaches budget resolutions. The bill stipulates that if a House of Congress has not agreed to a concurrent resolution on the budget for the fiscal year 2024 by April 15, 2023, the salaries of its members will be withheld and held in escrow. This measure intends to provide a financial incentive for timely budget agreements among legislators, reinforcing the importance of fiscal responsibility within Congress.

Contention

The bill's implementation may raise concerns regarding the effects on Congressional independence and the potential politicization of salaries. Critics could argue that withholding pay may pressure legislators to compromise on crucial issues that deserve thorough discussion and debate. Moreover, there are questions about whether this measure may disproportionately affect members who advocate for important, yet contentious, budgetary allocations. This contention could arouse debates over whether financial penalties are an appropriate method for encouraging legislative efficiency.

Last_action

As of January 9, 2023, HB225 has been referred to the House Committee on House Administration, and further discussions or votes on the bill will likely reflect the broader opinions regarding Congressional pay and fiscal accountability.

Companion Bills

US HB111

Related Budget Process Enhancement Act This bill modifies the federal budget process to withhold the salaries of Members of Congress and cancel the salaries of certain employees of the Office of Management and Budget when certain budget process requirements are not met. The bill also changes the assumptions that the Congressional Budget Office uses to calculate its baseline for discretionary spending to eliminate certain adjustments for inflation and other factors. (A baseline is a projection of federal spending and receipts during a fiscal year under current law.)

US SB6

Related bill Balanced Budget Accountability Act This bill requires the Office of Management and Budget (OMB), upon adoption by a chamber of Congress of a concurrent budget resolution for a fiscal year, to certify to the Speaker of the House of Representatives or the President pro tempore of the Senate whether that chamber has adopted a balanced budget. Balanced budget means a concurrent budget resolution providing that for FY2033 and each succeeding fiscal year to which the resolution applies total outlays do not exceed total receipts and are not more than 18% of the projected domestic product for such fiscal year. The bill requires the salary of Members of Congress to be held in escrow if OMB determines a chamber has not adopted a balanced budget for FY2024 before April 16, 2023, and for FY2025 before April 16, 2024. The bill also provides for the release of these funds to the Members. Beginning in FY2026, if OMB does not certify that a chamber has adopted a balanced budget before April 16 of the prior fiscal year, each Member of that chamber shall be paid at the rate of $1 annually for pay periods after that date in the same calendar year. The bill also requires that legislation in either chamber to increase revenue be agreed upon by an affirmative vote of three-fifths of the Members of that chamber.

Similar Bills

CA SCR161

The First Continental Congress.

NJ AR154

Urges Congress to provide for joint session at Independence Hall in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, in honor of semiquincentennial of Declaration of Independence.

DC B25-0825

Removal of the Highway Plan and Building Restriction Line from Lot 9 in Square 5914 along the West Side of Congress Street, S.E., S.O. 22-01642, Act of 2024

CA AJR27

Convention of states for proposing an amendment to the United States Constitution: federal balanced budget.

TX SJR1

Urging the Congress of the United States to propose and submit to the states for ratification a federal balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States and, in the event that Congress does not submit such an amendment on or before December 31, 2011, applying to Congress to call a convention for the specific and exclusive purpose of proposing an amendment to that constitution to provide, in the absence of a national emergency and on a two-thirds vote of Congress, for a federal balanced budget and requesting that the legislatures of each of the several states that compose the United States apply to Congress to call a convention to propose such an amendment.

US HB209

Inaction Has Consequences Act This bill withholds the salaries of Members of a chamber of Congress that has not passed each of the annual appropriations bills before the beginning of the fiscal year, beginning with FY2026. Salaries are released on the earlier of (1) the date on which the chamber of Congress passes the bills, or (2) the last day of the Congress.

US HB224

Inaction Has Consequences Act This bill withholds the salaries of Members of a chamber of Congress that has not passed each of the annual appropriations bills before the beginning of the fiscal year, beginning with FY2024. Salaries are released on the earlier of (1) the date on which the chamber of Congress passes the bills, or (2) the last day of the Congress.

NJ AJR97

Urges U.S. Congress to pass Equal Rights Amendment.