LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Us Congress US
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2670
Draft Versions
US
Us Congress House Bill HB2670
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HB2670
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
July 1, 2023
Compare
Bill
April 19, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
July 27, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
December 15, 2023
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 7, 2023
Compare