Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Committee on the Budget. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-76.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 41.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 217 - 215 (Roll no. 199). (text: CR H1979-2012)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 211 - 221 (Roll no. 198).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Mr. Ryan moved to recommit to the Committee on Ways and Means. (text: CR H2037)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with two hours of debate on H.R. 2811.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2811 and H.J. Res. 39. Resolution provides for two hours of general debate on H.R. 2811 and one hour of general debate on H.J. Res. 39. The previous question is considered as ordered with one motion to recommit allowed on each measure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 327. (consideration: CR H1979-2038)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 327 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2811 and H.J. Res. 39. Resolution provides for two hours of general debate on H.R. 2811 and one hour of general debate on H.J. Res. 39. The previous question is considered as ordered with one motion to recommit allowed on each measure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, Appropriations, Oversight and Accountability, Education and the Workforce, Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, Rules, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|