House | 05/07/2024 | Became Public Law No: 118-52. | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | Signed by President. | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | Presented to President. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2993) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 328. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. | ||
Senate | 10/03/2023 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 10/02/2023 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | ||
House | 10/02/2023 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4941) | ||
House | 10/02/2023 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 292. | ||
House | 10/02/2023 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4941-4942) | ||
House | 10/02/2023 | Mr. Comer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | ||
House | 07/12/2023 | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. | ||
House | 07/12/2023 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability. | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Introduced in House |