IB Union Calendar No. 308 118THCONGRESS 2 DSESSION H. R. 3195 [Report No. 118–377] To rescind Public Land Order 7917, to reinstate mineral leases and permits in the Superior National Forest, to ensure timely review of Mine Plans of Operations, and for other purposes. IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES MAY10, 2023 Mr. S TAUBER(for himself, Mr. CRENSHAW, Mr. GOSAR, Mr. ZINKE, Mr. G IMENEZ, Mr. NEWHOUSE, Ms. BOEBERT, Mr. LAWLER, Mrs. LESKO, Mr. E MMER, Mr. DUARTE, Ms. HAGEMAN, and Mrs. FISCHBACH) intro- duced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Natural Resources F EBRUARY9, 2024 Additional sponsor: Mr. F INSTAD F EBRUARY9, 2024 Reported with an amendment, committed to the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union, and ordered to be printed [Strike out all after the enacting clause and insert the part printed in italic] [For text of introduced bill, see copy of bill as introduced on May 10, 2023] VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:23 Feb 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H3195.RH H3195 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 •HR 3195 RH A BILL To rescind Public Land Order 7917, to reinstate mineral leases and permits in the Superior National Forest, to ensure timely review of Mine Plans of Operations, and for other purposes. VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:23 Feb 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H3195.RH H3195 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3 •HR 3195 RH Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1 tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2 SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3 This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Superior National For-4 est Restoration Act’’. 5 SEC. 2. SUPERIOR NATIONAL FOREST SYSTEM LANDS IN 6 MINNESOTA. 7 (a) R ESCISSION.—The order entitled ‘‘Public Land 8 Order No. 7917 for Withdrawal of Federal Lands; Cook, 9 Lake, and Saint Louis Counties, MN’’, issued by the Bu-10 reau of Land Management and dated January 31, 2023, 11 is hereby rescinded. 12 (b) T IMELYREVIEW.—The Secretary shall complete all 13 necessary environmental and regulatory review, including 14 processes subject to the National Environmental Policy Act 15 of 1969 (42 U.S.C. 4321 et seq.), for all Mine Plans of Oper-16 ations within the Superior National Forest lands in the 17 State of Minnesota— 18 (1) with respect to such Mine Plans of Oper-19 ations submitted before the date of the enactment of 20 this section, not later than 18 months after the date 21 of enactment of this section; and 22 (2) with respect to a Mine Plan of Operations 23 submitted or resubmitted in the 7 year period begin-24 ning on the date of the enactment of this section, not 25 VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:23 Feb 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H3195.RH H3195 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 4 •HR 3195 RH later than 18 months after the date on which such 1 Mine Plan of Operations is submitted or resubmitted. 2 (c) R EISSUANCE OFMINERALLEASES.— 3 (1) I N GENERAL.—The Secretary shall issue each 4 mineral lease, preference right lease, and prospecting 5 permit canceled by the Secretary relating to lands 6 within Superior National Forest during the period 7 beginning on January 31, 2021, and ending on the 8 date of the enactment of this section on the same 9 terms as were in effect on the date of such cancella-10 tions. 11 (2) J UDICIAL REVIEW.—A lease or permit issued 12 under paragraph (1) is not subject to judicial review. 13 (d) S ECRETARYDEFINED.—For the purposes of this 14 section, the term ‘‘Secretary’’ means— 15 (1) the Secretary of the Interior; or 16 (2) when used with respect to any unit of the 17 National Forest System, the Secretary of Agriculture. 18 VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:23 Feb 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H3195.RH H3195 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:23 Feb 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H3195.RH H3195 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS Union Calendar No. 308 118 TH CONGRESS 2 D S ESSION H. R. 3195 [Report No. 118–377] A BILL To rescind Public Land Order 7917, to reinstate mineral leases and permits in the Superior Na- tional Forest, to ensure timely review of Mine Plans of Operations, and for other purposes. F EBRUARY 9, 2024 Reported with an amendment, committed to the Com- mittee of the Whole House on the State of the Union, and ordered to be printed VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:23 Feb 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6651 Sfmt 6651 E:\BILLS\H3195.RH H3195 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS