4 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
| 6 | + | [Report No. 118–377] |
---|
| 7 | + | To rescind Public Land Order 7917, to reinstate mineral leases and permits |
---|
| 8 | + | in the Superior National Forest, to ensure timely review of Mine Plans |
---|
| 9 | + | of Operations, and for other purposes. |
---|
| 10 | + | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
| 11 | + | MAY10, 2023 |
---|
| 12 | + | Mr. S |
---|
| 13 | + | TAUBER(for himself, Mr. CRENSHAW, Mr. GOSAR, Mr. ZINKE, Mr. |
---|
| 14 | + | G |
---|
| 15 | + | IMENEZ, Mr. NEWHOUSE, Ms. BOEBERT, Mr. LAWLER, Mrs. LESKO, |
---|
| 16 | + | Mr. E |
---|
| 17 | + | MMER, Mr. DUARTE, Ms. HAGEMAN, and Mrs. FISCHBACH) intro- |
---|
| 18 | + | duced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Natural |
---|
| 19 | + | Resources |
---|
| 20 | + | F |
---|
| 21 | + | EBRUARY9, 2024 |
---|
| 22 | + | Additional sponsor: Mr. F |
---|
| 23 | + | INSTAD |
---|
| 24 | + | F |
---|
| 25 | + | EBRUARY9, 2024 |
---|
| 26 | + | Reported with an amendment, committed to the Committee of the Whole |
---|
| 27 | + | House on the State of the Union, and ordered to be printed |
---|
| 28 | + | [Strike out all after the enacting clause and insert the part printed in italic] |
---|
| 29 | + | [For text of introduced bill, see copy of bill as introduced on May 10, 2023] |
---|
| 30 | + | VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:23 Feb 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H3195.RH H3195 |
---|
| 31 | + | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 |
---|
| 32 | + | •HR 3195 RH |
---|
| 33 | + | A BILL |
---|
10 | | - | tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2 2 |
---|
11 | | - | •HR 3195 EH |
---|
12 | | - | SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 1 |
---|
13 | | - | This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Superior National For-2 |
---|
14 | | - | est Restoration Act’’. 3 |
---|
15 | | - | SEC. 2. SUPERIOR NATIONAL FOREST SYSTEM LANDS IN 4 |
---|
16 | | - | MINNESOTA. 5 |
---|
| 42 | + | tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2 |
---|
| 43 | + | SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3 |
---|
| 44 | + | This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Superior National For-4 |
---|
| 45 | + | est Restoration Act’’. 5 |
---|
| 46 | + | SEC. 2. SUPERIOR NATIONAL FOREST SYSTEM LANDS IN 6 |
---|
| 47 | + | MINNESOTA. 7 |
---|
18 | | - | ESCISSION.—The order entitled ‘‘Public Land 6 |
---|
19 | | - | Order No. 7917 for Withdrawal of Federal Lands; Cook, 7 |
---|
20 | | - | Lake, and Saint Louis Counties, MN’’, issued by the Bu-8 |
---|
21 | | - | reau of Land Management and dated January 31, 2023, 9 |
---|
22 | | - | is hereby rescinded. 10 |
---|
| 49 | + | ESCISSION.—The order entitled ‘‘Public Land 8 |
---|
| 50 | + | Order No. 7917 for Withdrawal of Federal Lands; Cook, 9 |
---|
| 51 | + | Lake, and Saint Louis Counties, MN’’, issued by the Bu-10 |
---|
| 52 | + | reau of Land Management and dated January 31, 2023, 11 |
---|
| 53 | + | is hereby rescinded. 12 |
---|
24 | | - | IMELYREVIEW.—The Secretary shall complete 11 |
---|
25 | | - | all necessary environmental and regulatory review, includ-12 |
---|
26 | | - | ing processes subject to the National Environmental Pol-13 |
---|
27 | | - | icy Act of 1969 (42 U.S.C. 4321 et seq.), for all Mine 14 |
---|
28 | | - | Plans of Operations within the Superior National Forest 15 |
---|
29 | | - | lands in the State of Minnesota— 16 |
---|
30 | | - | (1) with respect to such Mine Plans of Oper-17 |
---|
31 | | - | ations submitted before the date of the enactment of 18 |
---|
32 | | - | this section, not later than 18 months after the date 19 |
---|
33 | | - | of enactment of this section; and 20 |
---|
34 | | - | (2) with respect to a Mine Plan of Operations 21 |
---|
35 | | - | submitted or resubmitted in the 7 year period begin-22 |
---|
36 | | - | ning on the date of the enactment of this section, 23 |
---|
37 | | - | not later than 18 months after the date on which 24 |
---|
38 | | - | such Mine Plan of Operations is submitted or resub-25 |
---|
39 | | - | mitted. 26 3 |
---|
40 | | - | •HR 3195 EH |
---|
41 | | - | (c) REISSUANCE OFMINERALLEASES.— 1 |
---|
| 55 | + | IMELYREVIEW.—The Secretary shall complete all 13 |
---|
| 56 | + | necessary environmental and regulatory review, including 14 |
---|
| 57 | + | processes subject to the National Environmental Policy Act 15 |
---|
| 58 | + | of 1969 (42 U.S.C. 4321 et seq.), for all Mine Plans of Oper-16 |
---|
| 59 | + | ations within the Superior National Forest lands in the 17 |
---|
| 60 | + | State of Minnesota— 18 |
---|
| 61 | + | (1) with respect to such Mine Plans of Oper-19 |
---|
| 62 | + | ations submitted before the date of the enactment of 20 |
---|
| 63 | + | this section, not later than 18 months after the date 21 |
---|
| 64 | + | of enactment of this section; and 22 |
---|
| 65 | + | (2) with respect to a Mine Plan of Operations 23 |
---|
| 66 | + | submitted or resubmitted in the 7 year period begin-24 |
---|
| 67 | + | ning on the date of the enactment of this section, not 25 |
---|
| 68 | + | VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:23 Feb 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H3195.RH H3195 |
---|
| 69 | + | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 4 |
---|
| 70 | + | •HR 3195 RH |
---|
| 71 | + | later than 18 months after the date on which such 1 |
---|
| 72 | + | Mine Plan of Operations is submitted or resubmitted. 2 |
---|
| 73 | + | (c) R |
---|
| 74 | + | EISSUANCE OFMINERALLEASES.— 3 |
---|
43 | | - | N GENERAL.—The Secretary shall issue 2 |
---|
44 | | - | each mineral lease, preference right lease, and 3 |
---|
45 | | - | prospecting permit canceled by the Secretary relat-4 |
---|
46 | | - | ing to lands within Superior National Forest during 5 |
---|
47 | | - | the period beginning on January 31, 2021, and end-6 |
---|
48 | | - | ing on the date of the enactment of this section on 7 |
---|
49 | | - | the same terms as were in effect on the date of such 8 |
---|
50 | | - | cancellations. 9 |
---|
| 76 | + | N GENERAL.—The Secretary shall issue each 4 |
---|
| 77 | + | mineral lease, preference right lease, and prospecting 5 |
---|
| 78 | + | permit canceled by the Secretary relating to lands 6 |
---|
| 79 | + | within Superior National Forest during the period 7 |
---|
| 80 | + | beginning on January 31, 2021, and ending on the 8 |
---|
| 81 | + | date of the enactment of this section on the same 9 |
---|
| 82 | + | terms as were in effect on the date of such cancella-10 |
---|
| 83 | + | tions. 11 |
---|
56 | | - | ECRETARYDEFINED.—For the purposes of this 13 |
---|
57 | | - | section, the term ‘‘Secretary’’ means— 14 |
---|
58 | | - | (1) the Secretary of the Interior; or 15 |
---|
59 | | - | (2) when used with respect to any unit of the 16 |
---|
60 | | - | National Forest System, the Secretary of Agri-17 |
---|
61 | | - | culture. 18 |
---|
62 | | - | Passed the House of Representatives April 30, 2024. |
---|
63 | | - | Attest: |
---|
64 | | - | Clerk. 118 |
---|
| 88 | + | ECRETARYDEFINED.—For the purposes of this 14 |
---|
| 89 | + | section, the term ‘‘Secretary’’ means— 15 |
---|
| 90 | + | (1) the Secretary of the Interior; or 16 |
---|
| 91 | + | (2) when used with respect to any unit of the 17 |
---|
| 92 | + | National Forest System, the Secretary of Agriculture. 18 |
---|
| 93 | + | VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:23 Feb 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H3195.RH H3195 |
---|
| 94 | + | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:23 Feb 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H3195.RH H3195 |
---|
| 95 | + | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS Union Calendar No. |
---|
| 96 | + | 308 |
---|
| 97 | + | 118 |
---|