House | 11/18/2024 | House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 19, 2024. | ||
House | 11/18/2024 | Reported by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 118-741, Part I. | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Introduced in House |