1 | 1 | | I |
---|
2 | 2 | | 118THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION H. R. 324 |
---|
5 | 5 | | To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to expand the denial of |
---|
6 | 6 | | deduction for certain excessive employee remuneration, and for other purposes. |
---|
7 | 7 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
8 | 8 | | JANUARY12, 2023 |
---|
9 | 9 | | Mr. D |
---|
10 | 10 | | OGGETT(for himself, Mr. BLUMENAUER, Ms. CHU, Mr. CICILLINE, Mr. |
---|
11 | 11 | | C |
---|
12 | 12 | | OHEN, Ms. DELAURO, Mr. DESAULNIER, Mr. ESPAILLAT, Mr. |
---|
13 | 13 | | G |
---|
14 | 14 | | ARAMENDI, Mr. GRIJALVA, Ms. MOOREof Wisconsin, Mr. POCAN, Ms. |
---|
15 | 15 | | S |
---|
16 | 16 | | CHAKOWSKY, and Mrs. WATSONCOLEMAN) introduced the following bill; |
---|
17 | 17 | | which was referred to the Committee on Ways and Means |
---|
18 | 18 | | A BILL |
---|
19 | 19 | | To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to expand |
---|
20 | 20 | | the denial of deduction for certain excessive employee |
---|
21 | 21 | | remuneration, and for other purposes. |
---|
22 | 22 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1 |
---|
23 | 23 | | tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2 |
---|
24 | 24 | | SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3 |
---|
25 | 25 | | This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Stop Subsidizing Mul-4 |
---|
26 | 26 | | timillion Dollar Corporate Bonuses Act’’. 5 |
---|
27 | 27 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:24 Jan 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H324.IH H324 |
---|
28 | 28 | | kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 2 |
---|
29 | 29 | | •HR 324 IH |
---|
30 | 30 | | SEC. 2. EXPANSION OF DENIAL OF DEDUCTION FOR CER-1 |
---|
31 | 31 | | TAIN EXCESSIVE EMPLOYEE REMUNERA-2 |
---|
32 | 32 | | TION. 3 |
---|
33 | 33 | | (a) I |
---|
34 | 34 | | NGENERAL.— 4 |
---|
35 | 35 | | (1) E |
---|
36 | 36 | | XPANSION.—Section 162(m) of the Inter-5 |
---|
37 | 37 | | nal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended— 6 |
---|
38 | 38 | | (A) by striking ‘‘applicable employee remu-7 |
---|
39 | 39 | | neration’’ each place it appears in paragraphs 8 |
---|
40 | 40 | | (1), (4), and (5)(E) and inserting ‘‘applicable 9 |
---|
41 | 41 | | remuneration’’, 10 |
---|
42 | 42 | | (B) by striking ‘‘covered employee’’ each 11 |
---|
43 | 43 | | place it appears in paragraphs (1) and (4) and 12 |
---|
44 | 44 | | inserting ‘‘covered individual’’, and 13 |
---|
45 | 45 | | (C) by striking ‘‘employee’’ each place it 14 |
---|
46 | 46 | | appears in paragraph (1) and subparagraphs 15 |
---|
47 | 47 | | (A), (C)(ii), and (E) of paragraph (4) and in-16 |
---|
48 | 48 | | serting ‘‘individual’’. 17 |
---|
49 | 49 | | (2) C |
---|
50 | 50 | | OVERED INDIVIDUAL.—Paragraph (3) of 18 |
---|
51 | 51 | | section 162(m) of such Code is amended to read as 19 |
---|
52 | 52 | | follows: 20 |
---|
53 | 53 | | ‘‘(3) C |
---|
54 | 54 | | OVERED INDIVIDUAL.—For purposes of 21 |
---|
55 | 55 | | this subsection, the term ‘covered individual’ 22 |
---|
56 | 56 | | means— 23 |
---|
57 | 57 | | ‘‘(A) any individual who performs services 24 |
---|
58 | 58 | | (directly or indirectly) for the taxpayer (or any 25 |
---|
59 | 59 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:24 Jan 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H324.IH H324 |
---|
60 | 60 | | kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 3 |
---|
61 | 61 | | •HR 324 IH |
---|
62 | 62 | | predecessor) for any taxable year beginning 1 |
---|
63 | 63 | | after December 31, 2020, or 2 |
---|
64 | 64 | | ‘‘(B) any employee— 3 |
---|
65 | 65 | | ‘‘(i) who was the principal executive 4 |
---|
66 | 66 | | officer or principal financial officer of the 5 |
---|
67 | 67 | | taxpayer (or any predecessor) at any time 6 |
---|
68 | 68 | | during any preceding taxable year begin-7 |
---|
69 | 69 | | ning after December 31, 2016, and before 8 |
---|
70 | 70 | | January 1, 2021, or who was an individual 9 |
---|
71 | 71 | | acting in such a capacity, or 10 |
---|
72 | 72 | | ‘‘(ii) the total compensation of whom 11 |
---|
73 | 73 | | for any taxable year described in clause (i) 12 |
---|
74 | 74 | | was required to be reported to shareholders 13 |
---|
75 | 75 | | under the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 14 |
---|
76 | 76 | | by reason of such individual being among 15 |
---|
77 | 77 | | the 3 highest compensated officers for the 16 |
---|
78 | 78 | | taxable year (other than any individual de-17 |
---|
79 | 79 | | scribed in clause (i)). 18 |
---|
80 | 80 | | Such term shall include any employee who would be 19 |
---|
81 | 81 | | described in subparagraph (B)(ii) if the reporting 20 |
---|
82 | 82 | | described in such subparagraph were required as so 21 |
---|
83 | 83 | | described.’’. 22 |
---|
84 | 84 | | (3) C |
---|
85 | 85 | | ONFORMING AMENDMENTS .— 23 |
---|
86 | 86 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:24 Jan 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H324.IH H324 |
---|
87 | 87 | | kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 4 |
---|
88 | 88 | | •HR 324 IH |
---|
89 | 89 | | (A) The heading for section 162(m) of the 1 |
---|
90 | 90 | | Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by 2 |
---|
91 | 91 | | striking ‘‘E |
---|
92 | 92 | | MPLOYEE’’. 3 |
---|
93 | 93 | | (B) The heading for section 162(m)(4) is 4 |
---|
94 | 94 | | amended by striking ‘‘ |
---|
95 | 95 | | EMPLOYEE’’. 5 |
---|
96 | 96 | | (b) M |
---|
97 | 97 | | ODIFICATION OF DEFINITION OFPUBLICLY 6 |
---|
98 | 98 | | H |
---|
99 | 99 | | ELDCORPORATION.—Section 162(m)(2) of the Internal 7 |
---|
100 | 100 | | Revenue Code of 1986 is amended— 8 |
---|
101 | 101 | | (1) by inserting ‘‘, with respect to any taxable 9 |
---|
102 | 102 | | year,’’ after ‘‘means’’, and 10 |
---|
103 | 103 | | (2) by striking subparagraph (B) and inserting 11 |
---|
104 | 104 | | the following: 12 |
---|
105 | 105 | | ‘‘(B) that was required to file reports 13 |
---|
106 | 106 | | under section 15(d) of such Act (15 U.S.C. 14 |
---|
107 | 107 | | 78o(d)) at any time during the 3-taxable year 15 |
---|
108 | 108 | | period ending with such taxable year.’’. 16 |
---|
109 | 109 | | (c) R |
---|
110 | 110 | | EGULATORYAUTHORITY.— 17 |
---|
111 | 111 | | (1) I |
---|
112 | 112 | | N GENERAL.—Section 162(m) of the Inter-18 |
---|
113 | 113 | | nal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by adding at 19 |
---|
114 | 114 | | the end the following new paragraph: 20 |
---|
115 | 115 | | ‘‘(7) R |
---|
116 | 116 | | EGULATIONS.—The Secretary may pre-21 |
---|
117 | 117 | | scribe such guidance, rules, or regulations as are 22 |
---|
118 | 118 | | necessary to carry out the purposes of this sub-23 |
---|
119 | 119 | | section, including regulations— 24 |
---|
120 | 120 | | ‘‘(A) with respect to reporting, and 25 |
---|
121 | 121 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:24 Jan 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H324.IH H324 |
---|
122 | 122 | | kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 5 |
---|
123 | 123 | | •HR 324 IH |
---|
124 | 124 | | ‘‘(B) to prevent avoidance of the purposes 1 |
---|
125 | 125 | | of this section by providing compensation 2 |
---|
126 | 126 | | through a pass-through or other entity.’’. 3 |
---|
127 | 127 | | (2) C |
---|
128 | 128 | | ONFORMING AMENDMENT .—Paragraph (6) 4 |
---|
129 | 129 | | of section 162(m) of such Code is amended by strik-5 |
---|
130 | 130 | | ing subparagraph (H). 6 |
---|
131 | 131 | | (d) E |
---|
132 | 132 | | FFECTIVEDATE.—The amendments made by 7 |
---|
133 | 133 | | this section shall apply to taxable years beginning after 8 |
---|
134 | 134 | | December 31, 2022. 9 |
---|
135 | 135 | | Æ |
---|
136 | 136 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:24 Jan 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H324.IH H324 |
---|
137 | 137 | | kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS |
---|