Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB336 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 I
22 118THCONGRESS
33 1
44 STSESSION H. R. 336
55 To immediately resume construction of the border wall system along the
66 international border between the United States and Mexico to secure
77 the border, enforce the rule of law, and expend appropriated funds
88 as mandated by Congress, and for other purposes.
99 IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
1010 JANUARY12, 2023
1111 Mr. H
1212 IGGINSof Louisiana (for himself, Mrs. MILLER-MEEKS, Mr. GRAVESof
1313 Louisiana, Mr. R
1414 ESCHENTHALER, Mr. FLEISCHMANN, Mr. GOSAR, Mr.
1515 P
1616 OSEY, Mr. BALDERSON, Mrs. MILLERof Illinois, Mr. SMITHof New
1717 Jersey, Mr. C
1818 LYDE, Mr. FRY, Mr. CARL, Mr. HUIZENGA, Mr. CARTER
1919 of Georgia, Mr. S
2020 ESSIONS, Mr. GAETZ, Mr. JOHNSONof Ohio, Mrs.
2121 H
2222 ARSHBARGER, Mr. BABIN, Mr. BOST, Mr. LATTA, Mr. GROTHMAN, Mr.
2323 H
2424 UNT, Mr. LOUDERMILK, Mr. ZINKE, Mr. GUEST, Mr. ROY, Mr. BISHOP
2525 of North Carolina, Mrs. B
2626 OEBERT, Mr. RUTHERFORD, Mr. MOOLENAAR,
2727 Mr. O
2828 BERNOLTE, and Mr. JACKSONof Texas) introduced the following
2929 bill; which was referred to the Committee on Homeland Security
3030 A BILL
3131 To immediately resume construction of the border wall sys-
3232 tem along the international border between the United
3333 States and Mexico to secure the border, enforce the
3434 rule of law, and expend appropriated funds as mandated
3535 by Congress, and for other purposes.
3636 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
3737 tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
3838 VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:50 Jan 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H336.IH H336
3939 kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 2
4040 •HR 336 IH
4141 SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 1
4242 This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Finish the Wall Act’’. 2
4343 SEC. 2. BORDER WALL SYSTEM CONSTRUCTION. 3
4444 (a)(1) I
4545 MMEDIATELYRESUMEBORDERWALLSYS-4
4646 TEMCONSTRUCTION.—Not later than 24 hours after the 5
4747 date of the enactment of this Act, the Secretary of Home-6
4848 land Security shall resume all activities related to the con-7
4949 struction of the border barrier system (also known as, and 8
5050 referred to in this Act as, the ‘‘border wall system’’) along 9
5151 the international border between the United States and 10
5252 Mexico that were underway or being planned for prior to 11
5353 January 20, 2021. 12
5454 (2) N
5555 OCANCELLATIONS.—The Secretary of Home-13
5656 land Security may not cancel any contract for activities 14
5757 related to border wall system construction referred to in 15
5858 paragraph (1) that was entered into on or before January 16
5959 20, 2021. 17
6060 (3) U
6161 SE OFFUNDS.—The Secretary of Homeland 18
6262 Security shall expend all funds appropriated or explicitly 19
6363 obligated for border wall system construction referred to 20
6464 in paragraph (1) that were appropriated or obligated, as 21
6565 the case may be, beginning on October 1, 2016, to carry 22
6666 out this Act. 23
6767 (4) I
6868 MPLEMENTATION PLAN FORBORDERWALL 24
6969 S
7070 YSTEM.—Not later than 30 days after the date of the 25
7171 enactment of this Act, the Secretary of Homeland Security 26
7272 VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:50 Jan 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H336.IH H336
7373 kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 3
7474 •HR 336 IH
7575 shall submit to the appropriate congressional committees 1
7676 an implementation plan to complete, by not later than 2
7777 September 30, 2026, border wall system construction re-3
7878 ferred to in paragraph (1) and funded in accordance with 4
7979 paragraph (3). 5
8080 (b) P
8181 LANTOCOMPLETETACTICALINFRASTRUC-6
8282 TURE ANDTECHNOLOGYELEMENTS OFBORDERWALL 7
8383 S
8484 YSTEM.—Not later than 90 days after the date of the 8
8585 enactment of this Act, the Secretary of Homeland Security 9
8686 shall submit to the appropriate congressional committees 10
8787 an implementation plan, including quarterly benchmarks 11
8888 and cost estimates, for satisfying all requirements of bor-12
8989 der wall system construction referred to in subsection 13
9090 (a)(1), including tactical infrastructure, technology, and 14
9191 other elements as identified by the Department of Home-15
9292 land Security prior to January 20, 2021, through the ex-16
9393 penditure of funds appropriated or explicitly obligated, as 17
9494 the case may be, for use beginning on October 1, 2016, 18
9595 as well as any future funds appropriated by Congress. 19
9696 (c) U
9797 PHOLDNEGOTIATEDAGREEMENTS.—The Sec-20
9898 retary of Homeland Security shall ensure that all agree-21
9999 ments executed in writing between the Department of 22
100100 Homeland Security and private citizens, State, local, and 23
101101 Tribal governments, and other stakeholders are honored 24
102102 VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:50 Jan 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H336.IH H336
103103 kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 4
104104 •HR 336 IH
105105 by the Department relating to current and future border 1
106106 wall system construction as required by such agreements. 2
107107 SEC. 3. DNA COLLECTION CONSISTENT WITH FEDERAL 3
108108 LAW. 4
109109 Not later than 14 days after the date of the enact-5
110110 ment of this Act, the Secretary of Homeland Security shall 6
111111 ensure and certify to the Committee on Homeland Secu-7
112112 rity of the House of Representatives and the Committee 8
113113 on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs of the 9
114114 Senate that U.S. Customs and Border Protection is fully 10
115115 compliant with the DNA Fingerprint Act of 2005 at all 11
116116 border facilities that process adults, including as part of 12
117117 a family unit, in the custody of U.S. Customs and Border 13
118118 Protection at the border. 14
119119 SEC. 4. DEFINITIONS. 15
120120 In this Act: 16
121121 (1) A
122122 PPROPRIATE CONGRESSIONAL COMMIT -17
123123 TEES.—The term ‘‘appropriate congressional com-18
124124 mittees’’ means the Committee on Homeland Secu-19
125125 rity and the Committee on Appropriations of the 20
126126 House of Representatives and the Committee on 21
127127 Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs and 22
128128 the Committee on Appropriations of the Senate. 23
129129 (2) T
130130 ACTICAL INFRASTRUCTURE .—The term 24
131131 ‘‘tactical infrastructure’’ includes boat ramps, access 25
132132 VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:50 Jan 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H336.IH H336
133133 kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 5
134134 •HR 336 IH
135135 gates, checkpoints, lighting, and roads associated 1
136136 with a border wall system. 2
137137 (3) T
138138 ECHNOLOGY.—The term ‘‘technology’’ in-3
139139 cludes border surveillance and detection technology, 4
140140 including linear ground detection systems, associated 5
141141 with a border wall system. 6
142142 Æ
143143 VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:50 Jan 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H336.IH H336
144144 kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS