1 | 1 | | I |
---|
2 | 2 | | 118THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION H. R. 3438 |
---|
5 | 5 | | To require the Secretary of Defense report on the domestic content require- |
---|
6 | 6 | | ments major defense acquisition programs, to establish an enhanced |
---|
7 | 7 | | domestic content requirement for certain procurements, and for other |
---|
8 | 8 | | purposes. |
---|
9 | 9 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
10 | 10 | | MAY17, 2023 |
---|
11 | 11 | | Mr. N |
---|
12 | 12 | | ORCROSSintroduced the following bill; which was referred to the |
---|
13 | 13 | | Committee on Armed Services |
---|
14 | 14 | | A BILL |
---|
15 | 15 | | To require the Secretary of Defense report on the domestic |
---|
16 | 16 | | content requirements major defense acquisition pro- |
---|
17 | 17 | | grams, to establish an enhanced domestic content re- |
---|
18 | 18 | | quirement for certain procurements, and for other pur- |
---|
19 | 19 | | poses. |
---|
20 | 20 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1 |
---|
21 | 21 | | tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2 |
---|
22 | 22 | | SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3 |
---|
23 | 23 | | This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Military Industrial Na-4 |
---|
24 | 24 | | tional Defense Supply Act of 2023’’ or the ‘‘MINDS Act’’. 5 |
---|
25 | 25 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:49 Jun 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H3438.IH H3438 |
---|
26 | 26 | | kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 2 |
---|
27 | 27 | | •HR 3438 IH |
---|
28 | 28 | | SEC. 2. ENHANCED DOMESTIC CONTENT REQUIREMENT 1 |
---|
29 | 29 | | FOR MAJOR DEFENSE ACQUISITION PRO-2 |
---|
30 | 30 | | GRAMS. 3 |
---|
31 | 31 | | (a) A |
---|
32 | 32 | | SSESSMENTREQUIRED.— 4 |
---|
33 | 33 | | (1) I |
---|
34 | 34 | | N GENERAL.—Not later than one year 5 |
---|
35 | 35 | | after the date of the enactment of this Act, the Sec-6 |
---|
36 | 36 | | retary of Defense shall submit to the congressional 7 |
---|
37 | 37 | | defense committees a report assessing the domestic 8 |
---|
38 | 38 | | source content of procurements carried out in con-9 |
---|
39 | 39 | | nection with a major defense acquisition program. 10 |
---|
40 | 40 | | (2) I |
---|
41 | 41 | | NFORMATION REPOSITORY .—The Secretary 11 |
---|
42 | 42 | | of Defense shall establish an information repository 12 |
---|
43 | 43 | | for the collection and analysis of information related 13 |
---|
44 | 44 | | to domestic source content for products the Sec-14 |
---|
45 | 45 | | retary deems critical, where such information can be 15 |
---|
46 | 46 | | used for continuous data analysis and program man-16 |
---|
47 | 47 | | agement activities. 17 |
---|
48 | 48 | | (b) E |
---|
49 | 49 | | NHANCED DOMESTICCONTENTREQUIRE-18 |
---|
50 | 50 | | MENT.— 19 |
---|
51 | 51 | | (1) I |
---|
52 | 52 | | N GENERAL.—Except as provided in para-20 |
---|
53 | 53 | | graph (2), for purposes of chapter 83 of title 41, 21 |
---|
54 | 54 | | United States Code, manufactured articles, mate-22 |
---|
55 | 55 | | rials, or supplies procured in connection with a 23 |
---|
56 | 56 | | major defense acquisition program are manufactured 24 |
---|
57 | 57 | | substantially all from articles, materials, or supplies 25 |
---|
58 | 58 | | mined, produced, or manufactured in the United 26 |
---|
59 | 59 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:49 Jun 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H3438.IH H3438 |
---|
60 | 60 | | kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 3 |
---|
61 | 61 | | •HR 3438 IH |
---|
62 | 62 | | States if the cost of such component articles, mate-1 |
---|
63 | 63 | | rials, or supplies— 2 |
---|
64 | 64 | | (A) supplied not later than the date of the 3 |
---|
65 | 65 | | enactment of this Act, exceeds 60 percent of 4 |
---|
66 | 66 | | cost of the manufactured articles, materials, or 5 |
---|
67 | 67 | | supplies procured; 6 |
---|
68 | 68 | | (B) supplied during the period beginning 7 |
---|
69 | 69 | | January 1, 2024, and ending December 31, 8 |
---|
70 | 70 | | 2028, exceeds 65 percent of the cost of the 9 |
---|
71 | 71 | | manufactured articles, materials, or supplies; 10 |
---|
72 | 72 | | and 11 |
---|
73 | 73 | | (C) supplied on or after January 1, 2029, 12 |
---|
74 | 74 | | exceeds 75 percent of the cost of the manufac-13 |
---|
75 | 75 | | tured articles, materials, or supplies. 14 |
---|
76 | 76 | | (2) E |
---|
77 | 77 | | XCLUSION FOR CERTAIN MANUFACTURED 15 |
---|
78 | 78 | | ARTICLES.—Paragraph (1) shall not apply to manu-16 |
---|
79 | 79 | | factured articles that consist wholly or predomi-17 |
---|
80 | 80 | | nantly of iron, steel, or a combination of iron and 18 |
---|
81 | 81 | | steel. 19 |
---|
82 | 82 | | (3) R |
---|
83 | 83 | | ULEMAKING TO CREATE A FALLBACK 20 |
---|
84 | 84 | | THRESHOLD.— 21 |
---|
85 | 85 | | (A) I |
---|
86 | 86 | | N GENERAL.—Not later than 180 22 |
---|
87 | 87 | | days after the date of the enactment of this 23 |
---|
88 | 88 | | Act, the Secretary of Defense shall issue rules 24 |
---|
89 | 89 | | to determine the treatment of the lowest price 25 |
---|
90 | 90 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:49 Jun 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H3438.IH H3438 |
---|
91 | 91 | | kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 4 |
---|
92 | 92 | | •HR 3438 IH |
---|
93 | 93 | | offered for a foreign end product for which 55 1 |
---|
94 | 94 | | percent or more of the component articles, ma-2 |
---|
95 | 95 | | terials, or supplies of such foreign end product 3 |
---|
96 | 96 | | are manufactured substantially all from articles, 4 |
---|
97 | 97 | | materials, or supplies mined, produced, or man-5 |
---|
98 | 98 | | ufactured in the United States if— 6 |
---|
99 | 99 | | (i) the application paragraph (1) re-7 |
---|
100 | 100 | | sults in an unreasonable cost; or 8 |
---|
101 | 101 | | (ii) no offers are submitted to supply 9 |
---|
102 | 102 | | manufactured articles, materials, or sup-10 |
---|
103 | 103 | | plies manufactured substantially all from 11 |
---|
104 | 104 | | articles, materials, or supplies mined, pro-12 |
---|
105 | 105 | | duced, or manufactured in the United 13 |
---|
106 | 106 | | States. 14 |
---|
107 | 107 | | (B) T |
---|
108 | 108 | | ERMINATION.—Rules issued under 15 |
---|
109 | 109 | | this paragraph shall cease to have force or ef-16 |
---|
110 | 110 | | fect on January 1, 2030. 17 |
---|
111 | 111 | | (4) A |
---|
112 | 112 | | PPLICABILITY.—The requirements of this 18 |
---|
113 | 113 | | subsection— 19 |
---|
114 | 114 | | (A) shall apply to contracts entered into on 20 |
---|
115 | 115 | | or after the date of the enactment of this Act; 21 |
---|
116 | 116 | | and 22 |
---|
117 | 117 | | (B) shall not apply to a country that is a 23 |
---|
118 | 118 | | member of the national technology and indus-24 |
---|
119 | 119 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:49 Jun 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H3438.IH H3438 |
---|
120 | 120 | | kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 5 |
---|
121 | 121 | | •HR 3438 IH |
---|
122 | 122 | | trial base (as defined by section 4801 of title 1 |
---|
123 | 123 | | 10, United States Code). 2 |
---|
124 | 124 | | (c) M |
---|
125 | 125 | | AJORDEFENSEACQUISITIONPROGRAMDE-3 |
---|
126 | 126 | | FINED.—The term ‘‘major defense acquisition program’’ 4 |
---|
127 | 127 | | has the meaning given in section 4201 of title 10, United 5 |
---|
128 | 128 | | States Code. 6 |
---|
129 | 129 | | Æ |
---|
130 | 130 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:49 Jun 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H3438.IH H3438 |
---|
131 | 131 | | kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS |
---|