Senate | 11/14/2023 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5679-5687) | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3496. | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5679-5688) | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | Mr. Cline moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | ||
House | 09/29/2023 | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 43. | ||
House | 09/29/2023 | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 118-235. | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Introduced in House |