Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
On passage Passed by recorded vote: 218 - 203 (Roll no. 717). (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H6836-6837)
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 206 - 211 (Roll no. 716).
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6840-6842)
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 357, the Chair put the question on the motion to recommit and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Mrvan demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
Mr. Mrvan moved to recommit to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR H6840)
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 357.
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1147 and H.R. 357. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1147 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate and H.R. 357 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate. The resolution provides for a motion to recommit on both measures. It also provides that on any legislative day of the second session of the 118th Congress before January 9, 2024, the Speaker may dispense with organizational and legislative business and that the Journal of the proceedings of the previous day shall be considered as approved if applicable.
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 922. (consideration: CR H6836-6840)
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
Rule H. Res. 922 passed House.
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 922 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1147 and H.R. 357. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1147 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate and H.R. 357 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate. The resolution provides for a motion to recommit on both measures. It also provides that on any legislative day of the second session of the 118th Congress before January 9, 2024, the Speaker may dispense with organizational and legislative business and that the Journal of the proceedings of the previous day shall be considered as approved if applicable.
|
|
|
House
|
11/29/2023
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 226.
|
|
|
House
|
11/29/2023
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 118-282.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 9.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|