Senate
|
12/05/2023
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2023
|
On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6103-6104)
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3581.
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2023
|
Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6103-6105)
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2023
|
Mr. Bergman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 201.
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 118-251.
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Subcommittee Hearings Held
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|