House | 07/26/2023 | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. | ||
House | 07/26/2023 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | ||
House | 07/19/2023 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held | ||
House | 07/19/2023 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote. | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Subcommittee Hearings Held | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Introduced in House |