LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Us Congress US
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB4366
Draft Versions
US
Us Congress House Bill HB4366
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HB4366
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
September 6, 2023
Compare
Bill
June 28, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
July 28, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 11, 2024
Compare
Amended
Bill
March 6, 2024
Compare
Bill
November 3, 2023
Compare