House | 09/17/2024 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 576. | ||
House | 09/17/2024 | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. | ||
House | 09/17/2024 | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-681, Part I. | ||
House | 06/12/2024 | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 44 - 0. | ||
House | 06/12/2024 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 0. | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Introduced in House |