Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 289 - 133 (Roll no. 237).
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 467.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
H.Amdt.184 On agreeing to the Pettersen amendment (A003) Failed by recorded vote: 190 - 233 (Roll no. 236).
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2605-2607)
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Mr. Bucshon moved that the committee rise.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Pettersen amendment No. 3, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Pallone demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 429, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Pettersen amendment No. 3.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
H.Amdt.184 Amendment (A003) offered by Ms. Pettersen. (consideration: CR H2604-2605; text: CR H2604)
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
H.Amdt.183 On agreeing to the Mills amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 429, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Mills amendment No. 2.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
H.Amdt.183 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Mills. (consideration: CR H2603-2604; text: CR H2603)
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
H.Amdt.182 On agreeing to the Miller (OH) amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 429, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Miller (OH) amendment No. 1.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
H.Amdt.182 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Miller (OH). (consideration: CR H2603; text: CR H2603)
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
The House resolved into Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union for further consideration.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2602-2605)
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H.R. 467 as unfinished business.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
On motion that the committee rise Agreed to by voice vote.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Mr. Guthrie moved that the committee rise.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 467.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
The Speaker designated the Honorable Marjorie Taylor Greene to act as Chairwoman of the Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 429 and Rule XVIII.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 467, S.J. Res. 11 and H.J. Res. 45. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 467 under a structured rule with one of hour of general debate. S.J. Res. 11 and H.J. Res. 45 are considered under closed rules with one hour of general debate. Motion to recommit provided on H.R. 467 and H.J. Res. 45, and one motion to commit on S.J. Res. 11.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 429. (consideration: CR H2579-2587)
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 429 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 467, S.J. Res. 11 and H.J. Res. 45. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 467 under a structured rule with one of hour of general debate. S.J. Res. 11 and H.J. Res. 45 are considered under closed rules with one hour of general debate. Motion to recommit provided on H.R. 467 and H.J. Res. 45, and one motion to commit on S.J. Res. 11.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 47.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-67, Part I.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 19.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 10 .
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|