Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB469 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 I
22 118THCONGRESS
33 1
44 STSESSION H. R. 469
55 To require asylum officers at United States embassies and consulates to
66 conduct credible fear screenings before aliens seeking asylum may be
77 permitted to enter the United States to apply for asylum, and for
88 other purposes.
99 IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
1010 JANUARY24, 2023
1111 Mr. H
1212 ERNintroduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee
1313 on the Judiciary
1414 A BILL
1515 To require asylum officers at United States embassies and
1616 consulates to conduct credible fear screenings before
1717 aliens seeking asylum may be permitted to enter the
1818 United States to apply for asylum, and for other pur-
1919 poses.
2020 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
2121 tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
2222 SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
2323 This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Asylum Abuse Reduc-4
2424 tion Act’’. 5
2525 VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:09 Feb 03, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H469.IH H469
2626 kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 2
2727 •HR 469 IH
2828 SEC. 2. ASYLUM INTERVIEWS. 1
2929 (a) B
3030 ORDERCROSSINGS.—Notwithstanding section 2
3131 235(b)(1) of the Immigration and Nationality Act (8 3
3232 U.S.C. 1225(b)(1)), if an alien who is seeking asylum in 4
3333 the United States attempts to enter the United States 5
3434 from Canada or Mexico at a land port of entry without 6
3535 a valid visa or other appropriate entry document, the im-7
3636 migration officer who is inspecting the alien— 8
3737 (1) may not admit or parole the alien into the 9
3838 United States; and 10
3939 (2) shall advise the alien to schedule an asylum 11
4040 hearing with the most convenient United States em-12
4141 bassy or consulate in Canada or Mexico. 13
4242 (b) C
4343 REDIBLEFEARSCREENINGS.—An alien de-14
4444 scribed in subsection (a) may only be permitted to enter 15
4545 the United States to apply for asylum if an asylum officer 16
4646 stationed at a United States embassy or consulate— 17
4747 (1) has conducted an in-person or telephonic 18
4848 interview with the alien; and 19
4949 (2) as a result of such interview, has concluded 20
5050 that the alien— 21
5151 (A)(i) has been persecuted in the alien’s 22
5252 country of nationality on account of the alien’s 23
5353 race, religion, nationality, membership in a par-24
5454 ticular social group, or political opinion; 25
5555 VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:09 Feb 03, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H469.IH H469
5656 kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 3
5757 •HR 469 IH
5858 (ii) has a credible fear of persecution (as 1
5959 defined in section 235(b)(1)(B) of the Immigra-2
6060 tion and Nationality Act (8 U.S.C. 3
6161 1225(b)(1)(B))) if the alien returned to such 4
6262 country; or 5
6363 (iii) would be subject to torture by a gov-6
6464 ernment or public official acting under the color 7
6565 of law if the alien returned to his or her coun-8
6666 try of nationality; and 9
6767 (B) is otherwise eligible for asylum under 10
6868 section 208(a) of that Act (8 U.S.C. 1158(a)). 11
6969 SEC. 3. ASYLUM INELIGIBILITY. 12
7070 Section 208(a)(2) of the Immigration and Nationality 13
7171 Act (8 U.S.C. 1158(a)(2)) is amended by adding at the 14
7272 end the following: 15
7373 ‘‘(F) T
7474 RANSIT THROUGH THIRD COUN -16
7575 TRY.— 17
7676 ‘‘(i) I
7777 N GENERAL.—Except as pro-18
7878 vided in clause (ii), paragraph (1) shall not 19
7979 apply to any alien who, on or after the 20
8080 date of the enactment of this subpara-21
8181 graph, enters, attempts to enter, or arrives 22
8282 in the United States through the Southern 23
8383 land border after transiting through, on 24
8484 the way to the United States, one or more 25
8585 VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:09 Feb 03, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H469.IH H469
8686 kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 4
8787 •HR 469 IH
8888 countries other than the country of citizen-1
8989 ship, nationality, or last lawful habitual 2
9090 residence of the alien. 3
9191 ‘‘(ii) E
9292 XCEPTIONS.—Clause (i) shall 4
9393 not apply if— 5
9494 ‘‘(I)(aa) the alien demonstrates 6
9595 that he or she applied for protection 7
9696 from persecution or torture in one or 8
9797 more countries (other than the coun-9
9898 try of citizenship, nationality, or last 10
9999 lawful habitual residence of the alien) 11
100100 through which the alien transited on 12
101101 the way to the United States; and 13
102102 ‘‘(bb) the alien received a final 14
103103 judgment denying the alien protection 15
104104 in such country; 16
105105 ‘‘(II) the alien demonstrates that 17
106106 he or she is or has been subject to a 18
107107 severe form of trafficking in persons; 19
108108 or 20
109109 ‘‘(III) the one or more countries 21
110110 through which the alien transited on 22
111111 the way to the United States were 23
112112 not, at the time of the transit, parties 24
113113 to— 25
114114 VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:09 Feb 03, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H469.IH H469
115115 kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 5
116116 •HR 469 IH
117117 ‘‘(aa) the Convention Relat-1
118118 ing to the Status of Refugees, 2
119119 done at Geneva July 28, 1951 3
120120 (as made applicable by the Pro-4
121121 tocol Relating to the Status of 5
122122 Refugees, done at New York 6
123123 January 31, 1967 (19 UST 7
124124 6223)); or 8
125125 ‘‘(bb) the Convention 9
126126 against Torture and Other Cruel, 10
127127 Inhuman or Degrading Treat-11
128128 ment or Punishment, done at 12
129129 New York December 10, 1984. 13
130130 ‘‘(G) I
131131 NTERNAL RELOCATION .—Paragraph 14
132132 (1) shall not apply to an alien interviewed by an 15
133133 asylum officer under section 2(b) of the Asylum 16
134134 Abuse Reduction Act if the asylum officer 17
135135 makes a determination that the alien may avoid 18
136136 purported persecution or torture in the alien’s 19
137137 country of nationality by relocating to another 20
138138 part of such country.’’. 21
139139 SEC. 4. CRIMINAL BENCH WARRANTS. 22
140140 (a) I
141141 SSUANCE.—Each Federal judicial district shall 23
142142 appoint at least 1 magistrate or district court judge who, 24
143143 upon a showing of probable cause, shall issue a warrant 25
144144 VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:09 Feb 03, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H469.IH H469
145145 kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 6
146146 •HR 469 IH
147147 of arrest for a violation of section 243(a)(1) of the Immi-1
148148 gration and Nationality Act (8 U.S.C. 1253(a)(1)). 2
149149 (b) P
150150 ROBABLECAUSE.—An order of removal issued 3
151151 under any provision of the Immigration and Nationality 4
152152 Act (8 U.S.C. 1101 et seq.) that has been in existence 5
153153 90 days or more shall constitute prima facie evidence of 6
154154 probable cause to issue a warrant under subsection (a). 7
155155 SEC. 5. INAPPLICABILITY OF FLORES SETTLEMENT AGREE-8
156156 MENT TO ALIENS SUBJECT TO DETENTION. 9
157157 The stipulated settlement agreement filed in the 10
158158 United States District Court for the Central District of 11
159159 California on January 17, 1997 (CV 85–4544–RJK) 12
160160 (commonly known as the ‘‘Flores settlement agreement’’), 13
161161 shall not apply to the detention and custody of aliens sub-14
162162 ject to detention in the United States under the Immigra-15
163163 tion and Nationality Act (8 U.S.C. 1101 et seq.). 16
164164 Æ
165165 VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:09 Feb 03, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H469.IH H469
166166 kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS