|
12/17/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
|
Action Code: H11000, Type: Committee
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
On passage Passed by recorded vote: 227 - 203 (Roll no. 98). (text: CR H539)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 210 - 219 (Roll no. 97).
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H551-553)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 497, the Chair put the question on the motion to recommit and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Pallone demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Ms. Jacobs moved to recommit to the Committee on Energy and Commerce. (text: CR H548-551)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 497.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 7, H.R. 139, H.R. 382 and H.R. 497. All bills are considered under a closed rule with one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 75. (consideration: CR H539-551)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Rule H. Res. 75 passed House.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 75 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 7, H.R. 139, H.R. 382 and H.R. 497. All bills are considered under a closed rule with one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|