Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H797)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 498.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H797-798)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Mr. Guthrie moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 35.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-52.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 46 - 0.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 0 .
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|