House | 12/05/2023 | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 48 - 0. | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote. | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held | ||
House | 10/23/2023 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security. | ||
House | 09/26/2023 | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. | ||
House | 09/26/2023 | Introduced in House |