Senate
|
12/04/2023
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 5961.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 307 - 119, 1 Present (Roll no. 687).
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
The House adopted the amendments en gross as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 5961.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
The House resolved into Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union for further consideration.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6021-6027)
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H.R. 5961 as unfinished business.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
On motion that the committee rise Agreed to by voice vote.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Mr. Self moved that the committee rise.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Jackson (IL) amendment No. 12, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the amendment and by voice vote, announced the noes had prevailed. Mr. Jackson (IL) demanded a recorded vote, and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 891, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Jackson (IL) amendment No. 12.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 891, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Porter amendment No. 11.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Porter amendment No. 10, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the amendment and by voice vote, announced the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Porter demanded a recorded vote, and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 891, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Porter amendment No. 10.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Pfluger amendment No. 9, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the amendment and by voice vote, announced the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Meeks demanded a recorded vote, and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 891, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Pfluger amendment No. 9.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Ogles amendment No. 8, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the amendment and by voice vote, announced the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Ogles demanded a recorded vote, and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 891, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Ogles amendment No. 8.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 891, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Ogles amendment No. 7.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Ogles amendment No. 6, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the amendment and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Ogles demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 891, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Ogles amendment No. 6.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Ogles amendment No. 5, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the amendment and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Ogles demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 891, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Ogles amendment No. 5.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 891, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Norman amendment No. 4.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 891, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Gottheimer amendment No. 3.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 891, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Cherfilus-McCormick amendment No. 2.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Fitzpatrick amendment No. 1, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the amendment and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Fitzpatrick demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 891, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Fitzpatrick amendment No. 1.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 5961.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
The Speaker designated the Honorable Julia Letlow to act as Chairwoman of the Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 891 and Rule XVIII.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5283, H.R. 5961 and S.J. Res. 32. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5283 and H.R. 5961 under a structured rule and S. J. Res. 32 under a closed rule. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on each measure with one motion to recommit on H.R. 5283 and H.R. 5961 and one motion to commit on S. J. Res. 32.
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 891. (consideration: CR H6000-6015; text: CR H6005-6006)
|
|
|
House
|
11/28/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 891 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5283, H.R. 5961 and S.J. Res. 32. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5283 and H.R. 5961 under a structured rule and S. J. Res. 32 under a closed rule. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on each measure with one motion to recommit on H.R. 5283 and H.R. 5961 and one motion to commit on S. J. Res. 32.
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Rule H. Res. 869 failed passage of House.
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 869 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5893 and H.R. 5961. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5893, under a structured rule with one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5961 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit.
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 218.
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Committee on Financial Services discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Referred sequentially to the House Committee on Financial Services for a period ending not later than Nov. 9, 2023 for consideration of such provisions of the bill and amendment as fall within the jurisdiction of that committee pursuant to clause 1(h) of rule X.
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 118-270, Part I.
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 15.
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|