Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Received in the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 320 - 91 (Roll no. 172). (text: CR H2790-2791)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2814)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, the House resumed consideration on H.R. 6090.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, further proceedings on H.R. 6090 are postponed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
DEBATE - The House resumed with debate on H.R. 6090.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 6090.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 615, H.R. 2925, H.R. 3195, H.R. 764, H.R. 3397, H.R. 6285 and H.R. 6090. The rule provides for consideration of H.R. 615, H.R. 2925, H.R. 3195, H.R. 764, H.R. 3397, and H.R. 6090 under a closed rule, and H.R. 6285 under a structured rule. The rule provides for one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit on each bill.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1173. (consideration: CR H2790-2797)
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule H. Res. 1173 passed House.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1173 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 615, H.R. 2925, H.R. 3195, H.R. 764, H.R. 3397, H.R. 6285 and H.R. 6090. The rule provides for consideration of H.R. 615, H.R. 2925, H.R. 3195, H.R. 764, H.R. 3397, and H.R. 6090 under a closed rule, and H.R. 6285 under a structured rule. The rule provides for one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit on each bill.
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|