Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB6096 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 10/30/2023

                            I 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 6096 
To require annual reports on allied contributions to the common defense, 
and for other purposes. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
OCTOBER26, 2023 
Mr. M
OONEY(for himself, Mr. NORMAN, Mr. BISHOPof North Carolina, Mr. 
W
EBERof Texas, and Mr. BIGGS) introduced the following bill; which 
was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs 
A BILL 
To require annual reports on allied contributions to the 
common defense, and for other purposes. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Allied Burden Sharing 4
Report Act of 2023’’. 5
SEC. 2. FINDING; SENSE OF CONGRESS. 6
(a) F
INDING.—Congress finds that section 1003 of 7
the Department of Defense Authorization Act, 1985 (Pub-8
lic Law 98–525; 63 Stat. 2241)— 9
VerDate Sep 11 2014 17:33 Oct 28, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H6096.IH H6096
ssavage on DSKBC07HB2PROD with BILLS 2 
•HR 6096 IH
(1) expresses the sense of Congress that, due to 1
threats that are ever-changing, Congress must be in-2
formed with respect to allied contributions to the 3
common defense to properly assess the readiness of 4
the United States and the countries described in sec-5
tion 3(b) for threats; and 6
(2) requires the Secretary to submit to Con-7
gress an annual report on the contributions of allies 8
to the common defense. 9
(b) S
ENSE OFCONGRESS.—It is the sense of Con-10
gress that— 11
(1) the threats facing the United States— 12
(A) extend beyond the global war on ter-13
ror; and 14
(B) include near-peer threats; and 15
(2) the President should seek from each coun-16
try described in section 3(b) acceptance of inter-17
national security responsibilities and agreements to 18
make contributions to the common defense in ac-19
cordance with the collective defense agreements or 20
treaties to which such country is a party. 21
SEC. 3. REPORTS ON ALLIED CONTRIBUTIONS TO THE 22
COMMON DEFENSE. 23
(a) I
NGENERAL.—Not later than March 1 each year, 24
the Secretary, in coordination with the heads of other Fed-25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 17:33 Oct 28, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H6096.IH H6096
ssavage on DSKBC07HB2PROD with BILLS 3 
•HR 6096 IH
eral agencies, as the Secretary determines to be necessary, 1
shall submit to the appropriate committees of Congress 2
a report containing a description of— 3
(1) the annual defense spending by each coun-4
try described in subsection (b), including available 5
data on nominal budget figures and defense spend-6
ing as a percentage of the gross domestic products 7
of each such country for the fiscal year immediately 8
preceding the fiscal year in which the report is sub-9
mitted; 10
(2) the activities of each such country to con-11
tribute to military or stability operations in which 12
the Armed Forces of the United States are a partici-13
pant or may be called upon in accordance with a co-14
operative defense agreement to which the United 15
States is a party; 16
(3) any limitations placed by any such country 17
on the use of such contributions; and 18
(4) any actions undertaken by the United 19
States or by other countries to minimize such limita-20
tions. 21
(b) C
OUNTRIESDESCRIBED.—The countries de-22
scribed in this subsection are the following: 23
(1) Each member State of the North Atlantic 24
Treaty Organization. 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 17:33 Oct 28, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H6096.IH H6096
ssavage on DSKBC07HB2PROD with BILLS 4 
•HR 6096 IH
(2) Each member State of the Gulf Cooperation 1
Council. 2
(3) Each country party to the Inter-American 3
Treaty of Reciprocal Assistance (Rio Treaty), done 4
at Rio de Janeiro September 2, 1947, and entered 5
into force December 3, 1948 (TIAS 1838). 6
(4) Australia. 7
(5) Japan. 8
(6) New Zealand. 9
(7) The Philippines. 10
(8) South Korea. 11
(9) Thailand. 12
(c) F
ORM.—Each report under subsection (a) shall 13
be submitted in unclassified form, but may contain a clas-14
sified annex. 15
(d) A
VAILABILITY.—A report submitted under sub-16
section (a) shall be made available on request to any Mem-17
ber of Congress. 18
SEC. 4. DEFINITIONS. 19
In this Act: 20
(1) A
PPROPRIATE COMMITTEES OF CON -21
GRESS.—The term ‘‘appropriate committees of Con-22
gress’’ means— 23
VerDate Sep 11 2014 17:33 Oct 28, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H6096.IH H6096
ssavage on DSKBC07HB2PROD with BILLS 5 
•HR 6096 IH
(A) the Committee on Armed Services, the 1
Committee on Foreign Relations, and the Com-2
mittee on Appropriations of the Senate; and 3
(B) the Committee on Armed Services, the 4
Committee on Foreign Affairs, and the Com-5
mittee on Appropriations of the House of Rep-6
resentatives. 7
(2) S
ECRETARY.—The term ‘‘Secretary’’ means 8
the Secretary of Defense. 9
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 17:33 Oct 28, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H6096.IH H6096
ssavage on DSKBC07HB2PROD with BILLS