Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure rendered moot in Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Motion to table the motion to proceed to the measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 48. Record Vote Number: 309.
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S5501)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S5500)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 241.
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 226 - 196 (Roll no. 577). (text: CR H5297-5298)
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5313-5314)
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, the House resumed consideration of H.R. 6126.
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, the Chair announced further proceedings on H.R. 6126 would be postponed.
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 6126.
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4821, H.R. 4820 and H.R. 6126. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4821 and H.R. 4820 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate for each bill. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 6126, under a closed rule, with one hour of general debate. Each measure has one motion to recommit.
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 838. (consideration: CR H5297-5306)
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Rule H. Res. 838 passed House.
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 838 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4821, H.R. 4820 and H.R. 6126. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4821 and H.R. 4820 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate for each bill. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 6126, under a closed rule, with one hour of general debate. Each measure has one motion to recommit.
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|