Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB6182 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/18/2023

                            I 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 6182 
To extend and modify a pilot program to improve cyber cooperation with 
foreign military partners in Southeast Asia. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
NOVEMBER2, 2023 
Mr. C
ASTROof Texas (for himself and Mr. ISSA) introduced the following bill; 
which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition 
to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently de-
termined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions 
as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned 
A BILL 
To extend and modify a pilot program to improve cyber 
cooperation with foreign military partners in Southeast Asia. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Southeast Asia Part-4
nership Expansion Act’’. 5
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:41 Nov 17, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H6182.IH H6182
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HR 6182 IH
SEC. 2. EXTENSION AND MODIFICATION OF PILOT PRO-1
GRAM TO IMPROVE CYBER COOPERATION 2
WITH FOREIGN MILITARY PARTNERS IN 3
SOUTHEAST ASIA. 4
(a) I
NGENERAL.—Subsection (a) of section 1256 of 5
the William M. (Mac) Thornberry National Defense Au-6
thorization Act for Fiscal Year 2021 (Public Law 116– 7
283; 134 Stat. 3956; 10 U.S.C. 333 note) is amended— 8
(1) in the matter preceding paragraph (1), by 9
striking ‘‘in Vietnam, Thailand, and Indonesia’’ and 10
inserting ‘‘with covered foreign military partners’’; 11
(2) in paragraph (1)— 12
(A) by inserting ‘‘defensive’’ before 13
‘‘cyber’’; and 14
(B) by striking ‘‘Vietnam, Thailand, and 15
Indonesia’’ and inserting ‘‘covered foreign mili-16
tary partners’’; and 17
(3) in paragraph (2), by striking ‘‘Vietnam, 18
Thailand, and Indonesia on’’ and inserting ‘‘covered 19
foreign military partners on defensive’’. 20
(b) E
LEMENTS.—Subsection (b) of such section is 21
amended— 22
(1) in paragraph (1), by striking ‘‘Vietnam, 23
Thailand, and Indonesia’’ and inserting ‘‘covered 24
foreign military partners’’; and 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:41 Nov 17, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H6182.IH H6182
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HR 6182 IH
(2) in paragraph (2), by striking ‘‘Vietnam, 1
Thailand, and Indonesia’’ and inserting ‘‘covered 2
foreign military partners’’. 3
(c) R
EPORTS.—Subsection (c)(2)(B) of such section 4
is amended by striking ‘‘Vietnam, Thailand, and Indo-5
nesia’’ and inserting ‘‘covered foreign military partners’’. 6
(d) C
ERTIFICATION.—Subsection (d) of such section 7
is amended— 8
(1) by inserting ‘‘with any covered foreign mili-9
tary partner’’ after ‘‘scheduled to commence’’; and 10
(2) by striking ‘‘Vietnam, Indonesia, or Thai-11
land’’ and inserting ‘‘the covered foreign military 12
partner’’. 13
(e) E
XTENSION.—Subsection (e) of such section is 14
amended by striking ‘‘December 31, 2024’’ and inserting 15
‘‘December 31, 2029’’. 16
(f) D
EFINITIONS.—Subsection (f) of such section is 17
amended to read as follows: 18
‘‘(f) D
EFINITIONS.—In this section: 19
‘‘(1) A
PPROPRIATE COMMITTEES OF CON -20
GRESS.—The term ‘appropriate committees of Con-21
gress’ means— 22
‘‘(A) the Committee on Armed Services 23
and the Committee on Foreign Relations of the 24
Senate; and 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:41 Nov 17, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H6182.IH H6182
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 4 
•HR 6182 IH
‘‘(B) the Committee on Armed Services 1
and the Committee on Foreign Affairs of the 2
House of Representatives. 3
‘‘(2) C
OVERED FOREIGN MILITARY PARTNER .— 4
The term ‘covered foreign military partner’ means— 5
‘‘(A) Vietnam; 6
‘‘(B) Thailand; 7
‘‘(C) Indonesia; 8
‘‘(D) the Philippines; and 9
‘‘(E) Malaysia.’’. 10
(g) C
ONFORMINGAMENDMENTS.— 11
(1) Section 1256 of the William M. (Mac) 12
Thornberry National Defense Authorization Act for 13
Fiscal Year 2021 (Public Law 116–283; 134 Stat. 14
3956; 10 U.S.C. 333 note) is amended, in the sec-15
tion heading, by striking ‘‘
VIETNAM, THAILAND, 16
AND INDONESIA ’’ and inserting ‘‘COVERED FOR -17
EIGN MILITARY PARTNERS IN SOUTHEAST 18
ASIA’’. 19
(2) The table of contents for the William M. 20
(Mac) Thornberry National Defense Authorization 21
Act for Fiscal Year 2021 (Public Law 116–283; 134 22
Stat. 3388) is amended by striking the item relating 23
to section 1256 and inserting the following: 24
‘‘Sec. 1256. Pilot program to improve cyber cooperation with covered foreign 
military partners in Southeast Asia.’’. 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:41 Nov 17, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6211 E:\BILLS\H6182.IH H6182
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 5 
•HR 6182 IH
(3) The table of contents for title XII of the 1
William M. (Mac) Thornberry National Defense Au-2
thorization Act for Fiscal Year 2021 (Public Law 3
116–283; 134 Stat. 3905) is amended by striking 4
the item relating to section 1256 and inserting the 5
following: 6
‘‘Sec. 1256. Pilot program to improve cyber cooperation with covered foreign 
military partners in Southeast Asia.’’. 
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:41 Nov 17, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H6182.IH H6182
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB