Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 4 (Roll no. 126). (text: 4/15/2024 CR H2378-2379)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2415-2416)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6245.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2378-2380)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Mr. McHenry moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 273.
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 118-334.
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 49 - 0.
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|