Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 386.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 206 - 202 (Roll no. 193). (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H2970)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 203 - 207 (Roll no. 192).
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Ms. Manning moved to recommit to the Committee on Oversight and Accountability. (text: CR H2983-2984)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2983-2986)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, the House proceeded with further consideration of H.R. 7109.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule XIX, further consideration of H.R. 7109 is postponed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 7109.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6192, H.R. 7109, H.J. Res. 109 and H.R. 2925. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 6192 under a structured rule and H.R. 7109, H.J. Res. 109, and H.R. 2925 under a closed rule. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 6192, H.R. 7109, and H.J. Res. 109, and thirty minutes of general debate on H.R. 2925. One motion to recommit allowed on each bill.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1194. (consideration: CR H2970-2977)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1194 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6192, H.R. 7109, H.J. Res. 109 and H.R. 2925. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 6192 under a structured rule and H.R. 7109, H.J. Res. 109, and H.R. 2925 under a closed rule. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 6192, H.R. 7109, and H.J. Res. 109, and thirty minutes of general debate on H.R. 2925. One motion to recommit allowed on each bill.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 395.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Accountability. H. Rept. 118-476.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 20.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|