Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 341.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 251 - 170 (Roll no. 66). (text: CR H1013-1014)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1020-1021)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 7511, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Bishop (NC) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 7511.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2799 and H.R. 7511. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2799, under a structured rule with one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 7511 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1052. (consideration: CR H1013-1020)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Rule H. Res. 1052 passed House.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1052 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2799 and H.R. 7511. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2799, under a structured rule with one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 7511 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|