Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 0 (Roll no. 91). (text: 3/19/2024 CR H1216-1217)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1254-1255)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7520.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1216-1219)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Mrs. Rodgers (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1164-1165)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 345.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-418.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 50 - 0.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce Discharged
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|