Senate
|
09/18/2024
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
09/17/2024
|
The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
09/17/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
09/17/2024
|
On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5308)
|
|
|
House
|
09/17/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7858.
|
|
|
House
|
09/17/2024
|
Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5308-5309)
|
|
|
House
|
09/17/2024
|
Mrs. Rodgers (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2024
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 569.
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2024
|
Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2024
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-673, Part I.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 40 - 0.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 0.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|