House | 08/30/2024 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology. | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote. | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held | ||
House | 06/12/2024 | Subcommittee Hearings Held | ||
House | 05/03/2024 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Introduced in House |