4 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
| 5 | + | To authorize the Secretary of the Army to posthumously award the Distin- |
---|
| 6 | + | guished Service Cross to William D. Owens for his valorous actions |
---|
| 7 | + | from June 6, 1944, to June 8, 1944, during World War II at La |
---|
| 8 | + | Fiere Bridge in Normandy, France, while serving with the 505th Para- |
---|
| 9 | + | chute Infantry. |
---|
| 10 | + | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
| 11 | + | APRIL18, 2024 |
---|
| 12 | + | Ms. B |
---|
| 13 | + | ROWNLEY(for herself and Mr. SCHIFF) introduced the following bill; |
---|
| 14 | + | which was referred to the Committee on Armed Services |
---|
| 15 | + | A BILL |
---|
14 | | - | SECTION 1. AUTHORIZATION FOR POSTHUMOUS AWARD OF 3 |
---|
15 | | - | THE DISTINGUISHED SERVICE CROSS TO WIL-4 |
---|
16 | | - | LIAM D. OWENS FOR ACTS OF VALOR AT LA 5 |
---|
17 | | - | FIERE BRIDGE. 6 |
---|
| 24 | + | VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:41 Apr 30, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H8063.IH H8063 |
---|
| 25 | + | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 |
---|
| 26 | + | •HR 8063 IH |
---|
| 27 | + | SECTION 1. AUTHORIZATION FOR POSTHUMOUS AWARD OF 1 |
---|
| 28 | + | THE DISTINGUISHED SERVICE CROSS TO WIL-2 |
---|
| 29 | + | LIAM D. OWENS FOR ACTS OF VALOR AT LA 3 |
---|
| 30 | + | FIERE BRIDGE. 4 |
---|
19 | | - | AIVER OF TIMELIMITATIONS.—Notwith-7 |
---|
20 | | - | standing the time limitations specified in section 7274 of 8 |
---|
21 | | - | title 10, United States Code, or any other time limitation 9 |
---|
22 | | - | with respect to the awarding of certain medals to persons 10 |
---|
23 | | - | who served in the Armed Forces, the Secretary of the 11 |
---|
24 | | - | Army may award the Distinguished Service Cross under 12 |
---|
25 | | - | section 7272 of such title to William D. Owens for the 13 |
---|
26 | | - | acts of valor at La Fiere Bridge described in subsection 14 |
---|
27 | | - | (b). 15 |
---|
| 32 | + | AIVER OF TIMELIMITATIONS.—Notwith-5 |
---|
| 33 | + | standing the time limitations specified in section 7274 of 6 |
---|
| 34 | + | title 10, United States Code, or any other time limitation 7 |
---|
| 35 | + | with respect to the awarding of certain medals to persons 8 |
---|
| 36 | + | who served in the Armed Forces, the Secretary of the 9 |
---|
| 37 | + | Army may award the Distinguished Service Cross under 10 |
---|
| 38 | + | section 7272 of such title to William D. Owens for the 11 |
---|
| 39 | + | acts of valor at La Fiere Bridge described in subsection 12 |
---|
| 40 | + | (b). 13 |
---|
29 | | - | CTS OFVALORDESCRIBED.—The acts of valor 16 |
---|
30 | | - | referred to in subsection (a) are the actions of William 17 |
---|
31 | | - | D. Owens from June 6, 1944, to June 8, 1944, at La 18 |
---|
32 | | - | Fiere Bridge for which he was previously awarded the 19 |
---|
33 | | - | Bronze Star Medal. 20 |
---|
34 | | - | Passed the House of Representatives May 8, 2024. |
---|
35 | | - | Attest: |
---|
36 | | - | Clerk. 118 |
---|
37 | | - | TH |
---|
38 | | - | CONGRESS |
---|
39 | | - | 2 |
---|
40 | | - | D |
---|
41 | | - | S |
---|
42 | | - | ESSION |
---|
43 | | - | |
---|
44 | | - | H. R. 8063 |
---|
45 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
46 | | - | To authorize the Secretary of the Army to post- |
---|
47 | | - | humously award the Distinguished Service Cross |
---|
48 | | - | to William D. Owens for his valorous actions |
---|
49 | | - | from June 6, 1944, to June 8, 1944, during |
---|
50 | | - | World War II at La Fiere Bridge in Normandy, |
---|
51 | | - | France, while serving with the 505th Parachute |
---|
52 | | - | Infantry. |
---|
| 42 | + | CTS OFVALORDESCRIBED.—The acts of valor 14 |
---|
| 43 | + | referred to in subsection (a) are the actions of William 15 |
---|
| 44 | + | D. Owens from June 6, 1944, to June 8, 1944, at La 16 |
---|
| 45 | + | Fiere Bridge for which he was previously awarded the 17 |
---|
| 46 | + | Bronze Star Medal. 18 |
---|
| 47 | + | Æ |
---|
| 48 | + | VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:41 Apr 30, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H8063.IH H8063 |
---|
| 49 | + | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS |
---|