LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Us Congress US
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB815
Draft Versions
US
Us Congress House Bill HB815
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HB815
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
March 22, 2023
Compare
Bill
February 28, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 8, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 25, 2024
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 22, 2024
Compare
Bill
February 14, 2024
Compare