Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB8344 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/14/2024

                    I 
118THCONGRESS 
2
DSESSION H. R. 8344 
To require the Secretary of Agriculture to submit to Congress a report 
on available assistance to agricultural producers in the State of Texas 
that have suffered economic losses due to the failure of Mexico to 
deliver water. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
MAY10, 2024 
Ms. D
ELACRUZ(for herself, Ms. CROCKETT, and Mr. TONYGONZALESof 
Texas) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee 
on Agriculture 
A BILL 
To require the Secretary of Agriculture to submit to Con-
gress a report on available assistance to agricultural 
producers in the State of Texas that have suffered eco-
nomic losses due to the failure of Mexico to deliver 
water. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Texas Agricultural 4
Producers Assistance Act’’. 5
VerDate Sep 11 2014 16:04 Jun 08, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H8344.IH H8344
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HR 8344 IH
SEC. 2. REPORT ON AVAILABLE ASSISTANCE TO AGRICUL-1
TURAL PRODUCERS IN THE STATE OF TEXAS 2
THAT HAVE SUFFERED ECONOMIC LOSSES 3
DUE TO THE FAILURE OF MEXICO TO DE-4
LIVER WATER. 5
Not later than 180 days after the date of the enact-6
ment of this Act, the Secretary of Agriculture shall submit 7
to the Committee on Agriculture of the House of Rep-8
resentatives and the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, 9
and Forestry of the Senate a report that lists all existing 10
authorities of the Secretary and programs within the De-11
partment of Agriculture that are or could be made avail-12
able to provide assistance to agricultural producers in the 13
State of Texas that have suffered economic losses due to 14
the failure of Mexico to deliver water to the United States 15
in accordance with the Treaty Relating to the Utilization 16
of Waters of the Colorado and Tijuana Rivers and of the 17
Rio Grande signed at Washington on February 3, 1944, 18
and the Supplementary Protocol signed at Washington on 19
November 14, 1944. 20
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 07:19 Jun 14, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H8344.IH H8344
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS