1 | 1 | | I |
---|
2 | 2 | | 118THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 2 |
---|
4 | 4 | | DSESSION H. R. 8344 |
---|
5 | 5 | | To require the Secretary of Agriculture to submit to Congress a report |
---|
6 | 6 | | on available assistance to agricultural producers in the State of Texas |
---|
7 | 7 | | that have suffered economic losses due to the failure of Mexico to |
---|
8 | 8 | | deliver water. |
---|
9 | 9 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
10 | 10 | | MAY10, 2024 |
---|
11 | 11 | | Ms. D |
---|
12 | 12 | | ELACRUZ(for herself, Ms. CROCKETT, and Mr. TONYGONZALESof |
---|
13 | 13 | | Texas) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee |
---|
14 | 14 | | on Agriculture |
---|
15 | 15 | | A BILL |
---|
16 | 16 | | To require the Secretary of Agriculture to submit to Con- |
---|
17 | 17 | | gress a report on available assistance to agricultural |
---|
18 | 18 | | producers in the State of Texas that have suffered eco- |
---|
19 | 19 | | nomic losses due to the failure of Mexico to deliver |
---|
20 | 20 | | water. |
---|
21 | 21 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1 |
---|
22 | 22 | | tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2 |
---|
23 | 23 | | SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3 |
---|
24 | 24 | | This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Texas Agricultural 4 |
---|
25 | 25 | | Producers Assistance Act’’. 5 |
---|
26 | 26 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 16:04 Jun 08, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H8344.IH H8344 |
---|
27 | 27 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 |
---|
28 | 28 | | •HR 8344 IH |
---|
29 | 29 | | SEC. 2. REPORT ON AVAILABLE ASSISTANCE TO AGRICUL-1 |
---|
30 | 30 | | TURAL PRODUCERS IN THE STATE OF TEXAS 2 |
---|
31 | 31 | | THAT HAVE SUFFERED ECONOMIC LOSSES 3 |
---|
32 | 32 | | DUE TO THE FAILURE OF MEXICO TO DE-4 |
---|
33 | 33 | | LIVER WATER. 5 |
---|
34 | 34 | | Not later than 180 days after the date of the enact-6 |
---|
35 | 35 | | ment of this Act, the Secretary of Agriculture shall submit 7 |
---|
36 | 36 | | to the Committee on Agriculture of the House of Rep-8 |
---|
37 | 37 | | resentatives and the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, 9 |
---|
38 | 38 | | and Forestry of the Senate a report that lists all existing 10 |
---|
39 | 39 | | authorities of the Secretary and programs within the De-11 |
---|
40 | 40 | | partment of Agriculture that are or could be made avail-12 |
---|
41 | 41 | | able to provide assistance to agricultural producers in the 13 |
---|
42 | 42 | | State of Texas that have suffered economic losses due to 14 |
---|
43 | 43 | | the failure of Mexico to deliver water to the United States 15 |
---|
44 | 44 | | in accordance with the Treaty Relating to the Utilization 16 |
---|
45 | 45 | | of Waters of the Colorado and Tijuana Rivers and of the 17 |
---|
46 | 46 | | Rio Grande signed at Washington on February 3, 1944, 18 |
---|
47 | 47 | | and the Supplementary Protocol signed at Washington on 19 |
---|
48 | 48 | | November 14, 1944. 20 |
---|
49 | 49 | | Æ |
---|
50 | 50 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 07:19 Jun 14, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H8344.IH H8344 |
---|
51 | 51 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS |
---|