Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 224 - 187 (Roll no. 217). (text: CR H3287-3288)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 202 - 210 (Roll no. 216).
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3310-3311)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 8369, the Chair put the question on the motion to recommit and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Meeks demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Mr. Meeks moved to recommit to the Committee on Foreign Affairs. (text: CR H3294)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 8369.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 8369, H.R. 7530, H.R. 7343, H.R. 8146, H.R. 7581, H.R. 354, H. Res. 1213 and H. Res. 1210. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 8369, H.R. 7530, H.R. 7581, H.R. 354, H. Res. 1213, and H. Res. 1210 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate each. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 7343 and H.R. 8146 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate each. Rule provides for one motion to recommit each on H.R. 8369, H.R. 7530, H.R. 7343, H.R. 7581, H.R. 354, and H.R. 8146.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1227. (consideration: CR H3287-3294)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1227 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 8369, H.R. 7530, H.R. 7343, H.R. 8146, H.R. 7581, H.R. 354, H. Res. 1213 and H. Res. 1210. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 8369, H.R. 7530, H.R. 7581, H.R. 354, H. Res. 1213, and H. Res. 1210 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate each. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 7343 and H.R. 8146 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate each. Rule provides for one motion to recommit each on H.R. 8369, H.R. 7530, H.R. 7343, H.R. 7581, H.R. 354, and H.R. 8146.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|