Senate
|
11/21/2024
|
Message on Senate action sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/21/2024
|
Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6696)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/18/2024
|
Received in the Senate, read twice.
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2024
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 381 - 1 (Roll no. 465). (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H6017)
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2024
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6021-6022)
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2024
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 8932, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Foxx demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2024
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2024
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 8932, H.R. 7409 and H.R. 8446. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 8932, H.R. 7409, and H.R. 8446 under a closed rule, and provides for one hour of debate and one motion to recommit on each bill.
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2024
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1568. (consideration: CR H6017-6021)
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1568 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 8932, H.R. 7409 and H.R. 8446. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 8932, H.R. 7409, and H.R. 8446 under a closed rule, and provides for one hour of debate and one motion to recommit on each bill.
|
|
|
House
|
09/20/2024
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 589.
|
|
|
House
|
09/20/2024
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 118-695.
|
|
|
House
|
07/10/2024
|
Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 34 - 6.
|
|
|
House
|
07/10/2024
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
07/05/2024
|
Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
|
|
|
House
|
07/05/2024
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|