Senate | 02/13/2023 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 260 - 162 (Roll no. 118). (text: 2/8/2023 CR H762) | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H799-800) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J.Res. 24, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Raskin demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 24. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 185, H.J. Res. 24 and H.J. Res. 26 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 97. (consideration: CR H762-768) | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 97 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 185, H.J. Res. 24 and H.J. Res. 26 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability. | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Introduced in House |