House
|
04/18/2023
|
The Chair directed the Clerk to notify the Senate of the action of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the veto message of the President to H.J. Res. 27, the Chair put the question on will the House, on reconsideration, pass H.J. Res. 27, the objections of the President to the contrary notwithstanding. Under the Constitution, the vote must be taken by the yeas and nays. Further proceedings were postponed until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
The previous question was ordered with objection.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to a previous order of the House of April 10, 2023, the unfinished business is the further consideration of the veto message of the President on H.J.Res. 27. The House proceeded with one hour of debate on the objection of the President to the contrary notwithstanding. (consideration: CR H1782-1789)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
On motion to refer the bill and the accompanying veto message to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Motion to refer the bill and accompanying veto message to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
On passage, the objections of the President to the contrary notwithstanding Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 227 - 196 (Roll no. 187).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Failed of passage in House over veto On passage, the objections of the President to the contrary notwithstanding Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 227 - 196 (Roll no. 187).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
The Chair laid before the House the veto message from the President.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
The Chair announced that the objections of the President to H.J. Res. 27 would be spread at large upon the Journal and the veto message would be printed as a House document (118-26). Further consideration of the veto message and the resolution, H.J. Res. 27, is postponed until the legislative day of April 18, 2023. Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
The Chair laid before the House the veto message from the President. (text: CR H1715-1716)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Vetoed by President.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Presented to President.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Message on Senate action sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 43. Record Vote Number: 79.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1017-1024)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Received in the Senate, read twice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 227 - 198 (Roll no. 142). (text: CR H1221)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1232)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J. Res. 27, the Chair put the question on passage of the resolution and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Graves (MO) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 27.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 140, H.J.Res. 27 and S. 619. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 140, under a structured rule. The resolution provides for consideration of H.J.Res. 27 and S. 619, under closed rules. General debate is limited to one hour of debate on all measures.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 199. (consideration: CR H1221-1230)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 199 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 140, H.J. Res. 27 and S. 619. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 140, under a structured rule. The resolution provides for consideration of H.J.Res. 27 and S. 619, under closed rules. General debate is limited to one hour of debate on all measures.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 3.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 118-6.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 30 - 24.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|