House | 06/05/2023 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 73. | ||
House | 06/05/2023 | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-96. | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 12. | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries Discharged. | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Introduced in House |