1 | | - | H. Res. 1210 |
---|
2 | | - | In the House of Representatives, U. S., |
---|
3 | | - | May 15, 2024. |
---|
| 1 | + | IV |
---|
| 2 | + | 118THCONGRESS |
---|
| 3 | + | 2 |
---|
| 4 | + | DSESSION H. RES. 1210 |
---|
| 5 | + | Condemning the Biden border crisis and the tremendous burdens law |
---|
| 6 | + | enforcement officers face as a result. |
---|
| 7 | + | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
| 8 | + | MAY8, 2024 |
---|
| 9 | + | Mr. H |
---|
| 10 | + | IGGINSof Louisiana (for himself, Ms. LETLOW, Mr. BRECHEEN, Mr. |
---|
| 11 | + | G |
---|
| 12 | + | UEST, Mr. EZELL, and Mr. GREENof Tennessee) submitted the fol- |
---|
| 13 | + | lowing resolution; which was referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, |
---|
| 14 | + | and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to |
---|
| 15 | + | be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consider- |
---|
| 16 | + | ation of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee |
---|
| 17 | + | concerned |
---|
| 18 | + | RESOLUTION |
---|
| 19 | + | Condemning the Biden border crisis and the tremendous |
---|
| 20 | + | burdens law enforcement officers face as a result. |
---|
13 | 33 | | Whereas over 1,800,000 known ‘‘gotaways’’ have crossed the |
---|
14 | 34 | | border illegally and evaded apprehension, with the admin- |
---|
15 | 35 | | istration having no idea of their identity, whereabouts, or |
---|
16 | 36 | | intent; |
---|
17 | 37 | | Whereas at least 362 individuals on the terrorist watch list |
---|
18 | 38 | | have been apprehended trying to illegally enter the coun- |
---|
19 | 39 | | try between ports of entry since fiscal year 2021; |
---|
20 | 40 | | Whereas fentanyl and other synthetic opioids are pouring into |
---|
21 | 41 | | the United States, forcing local police departments to |
---|
22 | 42 | | issue naloxone, a lifesaving medication used to reverse |
---|
23 | 43 | | opioid overdoses, to every officer; |
---|
24 | 44 | | Whereas the suffering endured by the American people from |
---|
27 | 46 | | levels of drug-related deaths is the direct result of an un- |
---|
28 | 47 | | secured border; |
---|
29 | 48 | | Whereas elected Democrats from Colorado, Illinois, Massa- |
---|
30 | 49 | | chusetts, New York, Texas, and Washington, DC, have |
---|
31 | 50 | | declared states of emergency as a result of the border cri- |
---|
32 | 51 | | sis; |
---|
33 | 52 | | Whereas Democrat-led sanctuary cities have slashed city |
---|
34 | 53 | | budgets, including funding for law enforcement; |
---|
35 | 54 | | Whereas law enforcement officers in the United States have |
---|
36 | 55 | | suffered through calls by politicians and activists to |
---|
37 | 56 | | ‘‘defund the police’’ and are now suffering from histori- |
---|
38 | 57 | | cally low levels of recruitment and morale as a result of |
---|
39 | 58 | | these attacks to their profession; |
---|
40 | 59 | | Whereas migrant gangs, such as the violent Venezuelan gang |
---|
41 | 60 | | Tren de Aragua, actively recruit newly arrived illegal |
---|
42 | 61 | | aliens into theft rings and criminal networks; |
---|
43 | 62 | | Whereas New York City Police Department Commissioner |
---|
44 | 63 | | Edward Caban has warned New Yorkers of a ‘‘wave of |
---|
45 | 67 | | migrant crime’’, and Democrat Mayor Eric Adams has |
---|
46 | 68 | | claimed the migrant crisis will ‘‘destroy New York City’’; |
---|
47 | 69 | | Whereas, on February 23, 2024, Venezuelan national Jose |
---|
48 | 70 | | Antonio Ibarra was arrested and charged with the mur- |
---|
49 | 71 | | der of 22-year-old student Laken Riley; |
---|
50 | 72 | | Whereas Ibarra entered the country illegally in September |
---|
51 | 73 | | 2022 and was subsequently released by U.S. Customs |
---|
52 | 74 | | and Border Protection into the interior; |
---|
53 | 75 | | Whereas, on March 2, 2024, an illegal alien, who entered the |
---|
54 | 76 | | United States as a ‘‘gotaway’’ at an unknown time and |
---|
55 | 77 | | location, allegedly struck and killed Washington State |
---|
58 | 79 | | Whereas a Haitian national who entered the United States |
---|
59 | 80 | | via the unlawful Cuban, Haitian, Nicaraguan, and Ven- |
---|
60 | 81 | | ezuelan parole program, was arrested on March 13, |
---|
61 | 82 | | 2024, for the sexual assault of a 15-year-old girl at an |
---|
62 | 83 | | illegal alien shelter in Massachusetts; |
---|
63 | 84 | | Whereas an illegal alien from Lebanon apprehended while il- |
---|
64 | 85 | | legally crossing the southwest border on March 9, 2024, |
---|
65 | 86 | | admitted to being a Hezbollah terrorist and having inten- |
---|
66 | 87 | | tions to make a bomb; |
---|
67 | 88 | | Whereas, on March 21, 2024, illegal aliens in El Paso rushed |
---|
68 | 89 | | the border fence and Texas National Guard troops in an |
---|
69 | 90 | | effort to breach the border into the United States; |
---|
70 | 91 | | Whereas a previously deported illegal alien was charged on |
---|
71 | 92 | | March 23, 2024, with murdering 25-year-old Michigan |
---|
72 | 93 | | resident Ruby Garcia; |
---|
73 | 94 | | Whereas, on March 27, 2024, an illegal alien from China ille- |
---|
74 | 95 | | gally breached a military base in California and refused |
---|
75 | 96 | | to leave; |
---|
85 | | - | Resolved, That the House of Representatives— |
---|
86 | | - | (1) acknowledges that United States law enforce- |
---|
87 | | - | ment officers are bravely facing dangers and challenges 4 |
---|
88 | | - | •HRES 1210 EH |
---|
89 | | - | every day that are exacerbated by the unprecedented cri- |
---|
90 | | - | sis at the border, which affects the entire country; |
---|
91 | | - | (2) condemns the open border crisis that President |
---|
92 | | - | Joe Biden, ‘‘Border Czar’’ Vice President Kamala Har- |
---|
93 | | - | ris, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security |
---|
94 | | - | Alejandro Mayorkas, and other Biden administration of- |
---|
95 | | - | ficials have willingly created along the southwest border; |
---|
96 | | - | (3) urges the Biden administration, and State and |
---|
97 | | - | local elected officials, to encourage and support dedi- |
---|
98 | | - | cated law enforcement officers so those officers can pro- |
---|
99 | | - | tect the homeland, their cities, counties, or States, and |
---|
100 | | - | restore law and order; and |
---|
101 | | - | (4) recognizes and sympathizes with law enforce- |
---|
102 | | - | ment officers in the United States who have suffered |
---|
103 | | - | through the mental, physical, and psychological stress |
---|
104 | | - | associated with the lack of support, trust, and respect |
---|
105 | | - | they face in our country today. |
---|
106 | | - | Attest: |
---|
107 | | - | Clerk. |
---|
| 109 | + | Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1 |
---|
| 110 | + | (1) acknowledges that United States law en-2 |
---|
| 111 | + | forcement officers are bravely facing dangers and 3 |
---|
| 112 | + | challenges every day that are exacerbated by the un-4 |
---|
| 113 | + | precedented crisis at the border, which affects the 5 |
---|
| 114 | + | entire country; 6 |
---|
| 115 | + | (2) condemns the open border crisis that Presi-7 |
---|
| 116 | + | dent Joe Biden, ‘‘Border Czar’’ Vice President 8 |
---|
| 117 | + | Kamala Harris, Secretary of the Department of 9 |
---|
| 118 | + | Homeland Security Alejandro Mayorkas, and other 10 |
---|
| 119 | + | Biden administration officials have willingly created 11 |
---|
| 120 | + | along the southwest border; 12 |
---|
| 121 | + | (3) urges the Biden administration, and State 13 |
---|
| 122 | + | and local elected officials, to encourage and support 14 |
---|
| 123 | + | dedicated law enforcement officers so those officers 15 |
---|
| 124 | + | can protect the homeland, their cities, counties, or 16 |
---|
| 125 | + | States, and restore law and order; and 17 |
---|
| 126 | + | VerDate Sep 11 2014 06:26 May 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR1210.IH HR1210 |
---|
| 127 | + | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 5 |
---|
| 128 | + | •HRES 1210 IH |
---|
| 129 | + | (4) recognizes and sympathizes with law en-1 |
---|
| 130 | + | forcement officers in the United States who have 2 |
---|
| 131 | + | suffered through the mental, physical, and psycho-3 |
---|
| 132 | + | logical stress associated with the lack of support, 4 |
---|
| 133 | + | trust, and respect they face in our country today. 5 |
---|
| 134 | + | Æ |
---|
| 135 | + | VerDate Sep 11 2014 06:26 May 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR1210.IH HR1210 |
---|
| 136 | + | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB |
---|